EP0344306 - CATALYST AND PROCESS FOR PRODUCING IT [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been refused Status updated on 09.05.1994 Database last updated on 03.08.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 19.06.2009 | Change - representative | published on 22.07.2009 [2009/30] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Asea Brown Boveri Aktiengesellschaft Kallstadter Strasse 1 68309 Mannheim / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1989/49] | For all designated states Asea Brown Boveri Aktiengesellschaft Kallstadter Strasse 1 D-68309 Mannheim / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
CHU, Wing, Fong Geheimrat-Schott-Strasse 32 D-6906 Leimen / DE | 02 /
ROHR, Franz-Josef Forstweg 2 D-6941 Absteinach / DE | 03 /
PFEIFER, Norbert Karlsbader Strasse 4 D-6902 Sandhausen / DE | [1989/49] | Representative(s) | Rupprecht, Klaus, et al c/o ABB Patent GmbH Postfach 10 03 51 68128 Mannheim / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2009/30] | Rupprecht, Klaus, et al c/o ABB Patent GmbH Postfach 10 03 51 68128 Mannheim / DE | ||
Former [1989/49] | Rupprecht, Klaus, Dipl.-Ing., et al c/o ABB Patent GmbH, Postfach 10 03 51 D-68128 Mannheim / DE | Application number, filing date | 89906302.8 | 08.12.1988 | [1989/49] | WO1988EP01125 | Priority number, date | DE19873741888 | 10.12.1987 Original published format: DE 3741888 | [1989/49] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO8905186 | Date: | 15.06.1989 | Language: | DE | [1989/13] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0344306 | Date: | 06.12.1989 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 15.06.1989 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1989/49] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 15.06.1989 | Classification | IPC: | B01D53/36, B01J23/00 | [1989/49] | CPC: |
B01D53/945 (EP,US);
B01J23/00 (EP,US);
B01J23/78 (EP,US);
Y02T10/12 (EP,US);
Y10S502/524 (EP,US);
Y10S502/525 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, CH, DE, FR, GB, IT, LI, NL, SE [1989/49] | Title | German: | KATALYSATOR UND VERFAHREN ZU SEINER HERSTELLUNG | [1989/49] | English: | CATALYST AND PROCESS FOR PRODUCING IT | [1989/49] | French: | CATALYSEUR ET SON PROCEDE DE PRODUCTION | [1989/49] | File destroyed: | 15.01.2000 | Entry into regional phase | 22.08.1989 | National basic fee paid | 22.08.1989 | Designation fee(s) paid | 22.08.1989 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 22.08.1989 | Examination requested [1989/49] | 19.08.1991 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 29.02.1992 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 29.06.1992 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 22.12.1992 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 20.08.1993 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: ) | 31.01.1994 | Despatch of communication that the application is refused, reason: formalities examination [1994/26] | 10.02.1994 | Application refused, date of legal effect [1994/26] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 20.11.1990 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 15.10.1991 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 15.10.1992 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.12.1993 | 06   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | US3905918 [ ] (MAI GERHARD, et al); | US3904553 [ ] (CAMPBELL LARRY E, et al) |