EP0444032 - A METHOD AND DEVICE FOR PRODUCING WIRING HARNESSES [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 02.02.1995 Database last updated on 26.06.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 18.11.1995 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): AT | published on 10.01.1996 [1996/02] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states MERZ METALL- UND KUNSTSTOFFVERARBEITUNGS GMBH In der Kron 6 - 8 D-60489 Frankfurt / DE | [1991/36] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
SCHLAICH, Gerd Schellingstra e 12 D-7255 Rutesheim / DE | 02 /
EMMERICH, Herbert Starenweg 7 D-7050 Waiblingen / DE | [1991/36] | Representative(s) | Weber, Dieter, et al Weber, Seiffert, Lieke Postfach 61 45 65051 Wiesbaden / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1991/36] | Weber, Dieter, Dr., et al Weber, Dieter, Dr., Seiffert, Klaus, Dipl.-Phys., Lieke, Winfried, Dr. Postfach 61 45 D-65051 Wiesbaden / DE | Application number, filing date | 89906723.5 | 16.06.1989 | [1991/36] | WO1989DE00395 | Priority number, date | DE19883820637 | 18.06.1988 Original published format: DE 3820637 | [1991/36] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO8912900 | Date: | 28.12.1989 | Language: | DE | [1989/30] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0444032 | Date: | 04.09.1991 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 28.12.1989 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1991/36] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0444032 | Date: | 30.03.1994 | Language: | DE | [1994/13] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 28.12.1989 | Classification | IPC: | H01B13/00, H01R43/28 | [1991/36] | CPC: |
H01B13/01245 (EP);
H01R43/28 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, FR, GB, IT, LI, NL, SE [1991/36] | Title | German: | VERFAHREN UND VORRICHTUNG ZUR HERSTELLUNG VON KABELBÄUMEN | [1991/36] | English: | A METHOD AND DEVICE FOR PRODUCING WIRING HARNESSES | [1991/36] | French: | PROCEDE ET DISPOSITIF DE FABRICATION D'HARNAIS DE CABLES | [1991/36] | Entry into regional phase | 12.12.1990 | National basic fee paid | 12.12.1990 | Designation fee(s) paid | 12.12.1990 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 15.01.1990 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: FR | 12.12.1990 | Examination requested [1991/36] | 19.10.1992 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 29.04.1993 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 28.05.1993 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 29.09.1993 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 29.12.1993 | Fee for grant paid | 29.12.1993 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 31.12.1994 | No opposition filed within time limit [1995/12] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 18.07.1991 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 20.08.1992 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 11.06.1993 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 01.07.1991 | 03   M06   Fee paid on   18.07.1991 | 30.06.1992 | 04   M06   Fee paid on   20.08.1992 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 16.06.1994 | CH | 30.06.1994 | LI | 30.06.1994 | [1996/02] |
Former [1995/31] | CH | 30.06.1994 | |
LI | 30.06.1994 | Cited in | International search | [A]EP0008155 (LANSING BAGNALL LTD [GB]) | [A] - IBM TECHNICAL DISCLOSURE BULLETIN. vol. 27, no. 4B, September 1984, NEW YORK US Seite 2467 - 2470; R.H. APP et al.: "Computer-controlled cable harness manufacturing using a robot" siehe das ganze Dokument | Examination | DE3608243 |