EP0422041 - HYDRAULIC PRESSING APPARATUS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 03.06.1995 Database last updated on 26.06.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 03.06.1995 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 26.07.1995 [1995/30] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Società Impianti Termoelettrici Industriali s.p.A. S.I.T.I. Via Sempione 82 28040 Marano Ticino / IT | For all designated states WALCHHÜTER, Ulrico Piazza Giolitti, 6 I-20133 Milano / IT | [N/P] |
Former [1991/16] | For all designated states Società Impianti Termoelettrici Industriali s.p.A. S.I.T.I. Via Sempione 82 I-28040 Marano Ticino / IT | ||
For all designated states WALCHHÜTER, Ulrico Piazza Giolitti, 6 I-20133 Milano / IT | Inventor(s) | 01 /
WALCHHÜTTER, Ulrico Piazza Giolitti, 6 I-20133 Milano / IT | 02 /
BOSSETTI, Renato Viale Kennedy, 27 I-28100 Novarra / IT | [1991/16] | Representative(s) | Forattini, Amelia Internazionale Brevetti Ingg. ZINI, MARANESI & C. S.r.l. Piazza Castello 1 20121 Milano / IT | [N/P] |
Former [1991/16] | Forattini, Amelia c/o Internazionale Brevetti Ingg. ZINI, MARANESI & C. S.r.l. Piazza Castello 1 I-20121 Milano / IT | Application number, filing date | 89906764.9 | 30.05.1989 | [1991/16] | WO1989EP00610 | Priority number, date | IT19880020936 | 10.06.1988 Original published format: IT 2093688 | IT19880020937 | 10.06.1988 Original published format: IT 2093788 | IT19890019202 | 26.01.1989 Original published format: IT 1920289 | IT19890019203 | 26.01.1989 Original published format: IT 1920389 | [1991/16] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO8911969 | Date: | 14.12.1989 | Language: | EN | [1989/29] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0422041 | Date: | 17.04.1991 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 14.12.1989 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1991/16] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0422041 | Date: | 03.08.1994 | Language: | EN | [1994/31] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 14.12.1989 | Classification | IPC: | B30B15/16, B30B15/26 | [1991/16] | CPC: |
B30B15/161 (EP,US);
B30B15/16 (EP,US);
B30B15/26 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, CH, DE, FR, GB, IT, LI, SE [1991/16] | Title | German: | HYDRAULISCHE PRESSVORRICHTUNG | [1991/16] | English: | HYDRAULIC PRESSING APPARATUS | [1991/16] | French: | PRESSE HYDRAULIQUE | [1991/16] | Entry into regional phase | 28.11.1990 | National basic fee paid | 28.11.1990 | Designation fee(s) paid | 28.11.1990 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 21.12.1989 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: DE | 28.11.1990 | Examination requested [1991/16] | 30.03.1993 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 27.07.1993 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 16.08.1993 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 07.02.1994 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 21.04.1994 | Fee for grant paid | 21.04.1994 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | EP93117772.9 / EP0594217 | Opposition(s) | 04.05.1995 | No opposition filed within time limit [1995/30] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 14.05.1991 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 18.05.1992 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 07.05.1993 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 09.05.1994 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 03.08.1994 | CH | 03.08.1994 | LI | 03.08.1994 | [1995/15] |
Former [1995/11] | CH | 03.08.1994 | |
LI | 03.08.1994 | Cited in | International search | [Y]JP56111594 ; | DE1627843 [ ] (HASENCLEVER AG MASCHF); | US3608435 [ ] (CONABEE RAYMOND S, et al); | EP0116024 [ ] (PALMERS GORAN); | US4524582 [ ] (LUCAS DELBERT E [US], et al) | [Y] - Patent Abstracts of Japan, vol. 51, no. 190 (M-100)(862), 4 December 1981; & JP-A-56111594 (HITACHI SEISAKUSHO K.K.) 3 September 1981, & JP56111594 A 19810903 |