EP0428526 - METHOD FOR XEROGRAPHIC PRINTING OF A TEXTILE MATERIAL [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 10.12.1994 Database last updated on 15.06.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 30.11.2007 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): FR | published on 02.01.2008 [2008/01] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states VALTION TEKNILLINEN TUTKIMUSKESKUS Vuorimiehentie 5 02150 Espoo 15 / FI | [N/P] |
Former [1992/23] | For all designated states VALTION TEKNILLINEN TUTKIMUSKESKUS Vuorimiehentie 5 SF-02150 Espoo 15 / FI | ||
Former [1991/22] | For all designated states VALTION TEKNILLINEN TUTKIMUSKESKUS Biologinkuja 5 SF-02150 Espoo / FI | Inventor(s) | 01 /
MALMSTRÖM, Ben Lindforsinkatu 16 A SF- 33720 Tampere / FI | 02 /
EPSTEIN, Mikael Lindforsinkatu 8 E SF-33720 Tampere / FI | [1991/22] | Representative(s) | Smulders, Theodorus A.H.J., et al Vereenigde Postbus 87930 2508 DH Den Haag / NL | [N/P] |
Former [1991/22] | Smulders, Theodorus A.H.J., Ir., et al Vereenigde Octrooibureaux Nieuwe Parklaan 97 NL-2587 BN 's-Gravenhage / NL | Application number, filing date | 89906781.3 | 14.06.1989 | [1991/22] | WO1989FI00111 | Priority number, date | FI19880002949 | 21.06.1988 Original published format: FI 882949 | [1991/22] | Filing language | FI | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO8912552 | Date: | 28.12.1989 | Language: | EN | [1989/30] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0428526 | Date: | 29.05.1991 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 28.12.1989 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1991/22] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0428526 | Date: | 09.02.1994 | Language: | EN | [1994/06] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | SE | 28.12.1989 | Classification | IPC: | D06P1/00, D06P5/00, G03G15/16, G03G15/22, G06K15/12 | [1994/06] | CPC: |
G06K15/1295 (EP);
D06P1/0032 (EP);
D06P5/003 (EP);
G03G15/1625 (EP);
G03G15/221 (EP);
G03G15/6591 (EP);
|
Former IPC [1991/22] | B41J3/18, B41J2/385 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, FR, GB, IT, LI, LU, NL, SE [1991/22] | Title | German: | VERFAHREN ZUM XEROGRAPHISCHEN DRUCKEN EINES TEXTILMATERIALS | [1991/22] | English: | METHOD FOR XEROGRAPHIC PRINTING OF A TEXTILE MATERIAL | [1991/22] | French: | PROCEDE D'IMPRESSION XEROGRAPHIQUE D'UN MATERIAU TEXTILE | [1991/22] | File destroyed: | 20.04.2002 | Entry into regional phase | 03.01.1990 | Translation filed | 20.12.1990 | National basic fee paid | 20.12.1990 | Designation fee(s) paid | 20.12.1990 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 15.01.1990 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: DE | 20.12.1990 | Examination requested [1991/22] | 13.10.1992 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 12.02.1993 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 01.04.1993 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 30.07.1993 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 29.10.1993 | Fee for grant paid | 29.10.1993 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 10.11.1994 | No opposition filed within time limit [1995/05] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 28.06.1991 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 30.06.1992 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 30.06.1993 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 09.02.1994 | BE | 09.02.1994 | CH | 09.02.1994 | DE | 09.02.1994 | FR | 09.02.1994 | IT | 09.02.1994 | LI | 09.02.1994 | NL | 09.02.1994 | SE | 09.02.1994 | GB | 14.06.1994 | LU | 30.06.1994 | [2002/24] |
Former [2000/06] | AT | 09.02.1994 | |
BE | 09.02.1994 | ||
CH | 09.02.1994 | ||
DE | 09.02.1994 | ||
IT | 09.02.1994 | ||
LI | 09.02.1994 | ||
NL | 09.02.1994 | ||
SE | 09.02.1994 | ||
GB | 14.06.1994 | ||
LU | 30.06.1994 | ||
Former [1999/42] | AT | 09.02.1994 | |
BE | 09.02.1994 | ||
CH | 09.02.1994 | ||
DE | 09.02.1994 | ||
IT | 09.02.1994 | ||
LI | 09.02.1994 | ||
NL | 09.02.1994 | ||
SE | 09.02.1994 | ||
GB | 14.06.1994 | ||
Former [1995/37] | AT | 09.02.1994 | |
BE | 09.02.1994 | ||
CH | 09.02.1994 | ||
DE | 09.02.1994 | ||
LI | 09.02.1994 | ||
NL | 09.02.1994 | ||
SE | 09.02.1994 | ||
GB | 14.06.1994 | ||
Former [1995/10] | AT | 09.02.1994 | |
BE | 09.02.1994 | ||
CH | 09.02.1994 | ||
DE | 09.02.1994 | ||
LI | 09.02.1994 | ||
NL | 09.02.1994 | ||
SE | 09.02.1994 | ||
Former [1994/49] | AT | 09.02.1994 | |
BE | 09.02.1994 | ||
CH | 09.02.1994 | ||
DE | 09.02.1994 | ||
LI | 09.02.1994 | ||
SE | 09.02.1994 | ||
Former [1994/47] | AT | 09.02.1994 | |
CH | 09.02.1994 | ||
DE | 09.02.1994 | ||
LI | 09.02.1994 | ||
SE | 09.02.1994 | ||
Former [1994/46] | AT | 09.02.1994 | |
DE | 09.02.1994 | ||
SE | 09.02.1994 | ||
Former [1994/45] | DE | 09.02.1994 | |
SE | 09.02.1994 | ||
Former [1994/45] | SE | 09.02.1994 | Cited in | International search | [Y]WO8704393 ; | [Y]DE3422285 ; | [Y]US4027049 ; | [Y]GB1273814 ; | [Y]EP0097954 |