EP0434688 - SEEKING MULTITASKING DISK CONTROLLER [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 02.10.1998 Database last updated on 26.06.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 28.12.2002 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): NL | published on 12.02.2003 [2003/07] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states WANG LABORATORIES, INC. 600 Technology Park Drive Billerica, MA 01821 / US | [1997/15] |
Former [1991/27] | For all designated states WANG LABORATORIES, INC. One Industrial Avenue, M/S 014-B7D Lowell, MA 01851 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
FRISSEL, John, Mark 5 Horseshoe Road Dracut, MA 01826 / US | [1991/27] | Representative(s) | Behrens, Dieter, et al Wuesthoff & Wuesthoff Patentanwälte PartG mbB Schweigerstrasse 2 81541 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1991/27] | Behrens, Dieter, Dr.-Ing., et al Wuesthoff & Wuesthoff Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Schweigerstrasse 2 D-81541 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 89906866.2 | 16.05.1989 | [1991/27] | WO1989US02098 | Priority number, date | US19880213430 | 30.06.1988 Original published format: US 213430 | [1991/27] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9000300 | Date: | 11.01.1990 | Language: | EN | [1990/02] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0434688 | Date: | 03.07.1991 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 11.01.1990 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1991/27] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0434688 | Date: | 26.11.1997 | Language: | EN | [1997/48] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 11.01.1990 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 18.10.1991 | Classification | IPC: | G06F3/06, G11B19/14, G11B19/16, G11B21/06 | [1991/50] | CPC: |
G06F3/0601 (EP,US);
G11B19/06 (EP,US);
G11B19/14 (EP,US);
G11B21/083 (EP,US);
G06F3/0673 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [1991/27] | G11B21/08, G06F13/00 | Designated contracting states | BE, DE, FR, GB, NL [1991/27] | Title | German: | SUCHENDE MULTITASKING-PLATTENSTEUERUNG | [1997/48] | English: | SEEKING MULTITASKING DISK CONTROLLER | [1991/27] | French: | CONTROLEUR DE DISQUES MULTITACHES A COMMANDE DE POSITIONNEMENT | [1991/27] |
Former [1991/27] | SUCHENDE MEHRFZWECK-PLATTENSTEUERUNG | Entry into regional phase | 31.12.1990 | National basic fee paid | 31.12.1990 | Search fee paid | 31.12.1990 | Designation fee(s) paid | 31.12.1990 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 04.01.1990 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: DE | 31.12.1990 | Examination requested [1991/27] | 30.03.1994 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 28.07.1994 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 15.11.1996 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: No) | 09.05.1997 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: later approval) | 27.05.1997 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 20.08.1997 | Fee for grant paid | 20.08.1997 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 27.08.1998 | No opposition filed within time limit [1998/47] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 15.05.1991 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 15.05.1992 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 17.05.1993 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 16.05.1994 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 26.04.1995 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 22.04.1996 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 28.04.1997 | Renewal fee patent year 09 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | BE | 26.11.1997 | NL | 26.11.1997 | [2003/07] |
Former [1998/46] | BE | 26.11.1997 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]DE3639549 (HITACHI LTD [JP]); | [A]US4494157 (INA KENZO [JP], et al) | [A] - MINI MICRO SYSTEMS. vol. 19, no. 2, February 1, 1986, BOSTON US pages 95 - 100; J.FISHER: 'SUPPER-SCSI CONTROLLERS BOOST I/O PERFORMANCE ' | International search | [A]US4310882 (HUNTER PAUL W, et al) |