EP0451141 - IMMOBILIZED SEQUENCE-SPECIFIC PROBES [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 24.09.1999 Database last updated on 13.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 24.09.1999 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 10.11.1999 [1999/45] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states F. Hoffmann-La Roche AG Postfach 3255 4002 Basel / CH | [N/P] |
Former [1998/47] | For all designated states F. HOFFMANN-LA ROCHE AG Postfach 3255 4002 Basel / CH | ||
Former [1992/28] | For all designated states F. HOFFMANN-LA ROCHE AG Postfach 3255 CH-4002 Basel / CH | ||
Former [1991/42] | For all designated states CETUS CORPORATION 1400 Fifty-Third Street Emeryville California 94608 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
SAIKI, Randall, K. 320 39th Street Richmond, CA 94805 / US | 02 /
ERLICH, Henry, A. 3936 Rhoda Avenue Oakland, CA 94602 / US | [1991/42] | Representative(s) | Knauer, Andreas Martin, et al Roche Diagnostics GmbH Patent Department 68298 Mannheim / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1999/04] | Roche Diagnostics Boehringer Mannheim GMBH Dr. Knauer et al. Patent Department, et al Sandhofer Strasse 116 D-68305 Mannheim / DE | ||
Former [1992/28] | (deleted) | ||
Former [1991/42] | Bizley, Richard Edward, et al Hepworth, Lawrence, Bryer & Bizley Merlin House Falconry Court Bakers Lane Epping Essex CM16 5DQ / GB | Application number, filing date | 89906987.6 | 18.05.1989 | [1991/42] | WO1989US02170 | Priority number, date | US19880197000 | 20.05.1988 Original published format: US 197000 | US19890347495 | 04.05.1989 Original published format: US 347495 | [1991/42] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO8911548 | Date: | 30.11.1989 | Language: | EN | [1989/28] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0451141 | Date: | 16.10.1991 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 30.11.1989 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1991/42] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0451141 | Date: | 18.11.1998 | Language: | EN | [1998/47] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 30.11.1989 | Classification | IPC: | C12Q1/68 | [1991/42] | CPC: |
C12Q1/6834 (EP)
| C-Set: |
C12Q1/6834, C12Q2525/197, C12Q2523/313 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, FR, GB, IT, LI, LU, NL, SE [1991/42] | Title | German: | BEFESTIGUNG VON SEQUENZSPEZIFISCHEN PROBEN | [1991/42] | English: | IMMOBILIZED SEQUENCE-SPECIFIC PROBES | [1991/42] | French: | SONDES SPECIFIQUES A DES SEQUENCES IMMOBILISEES | [1991/42] | Entry into regional phase | 14.11.1990 | National basic fee paid | 14.11.1990 | Designation fee(s) paid | 14.11.1990 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 13.11.1989 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: DE | 14.11.1990 | Examination requested [1991/42] | 19.10.1994 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 24.04.1995 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 09.11.1995 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 13.03.1996 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 14.11.1996 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 14.03.1997 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 12.12.1997 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 30.03.1998 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 23.06.1998 | Fee for grant paid | 23.06.1998 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 19.08.1999 | No opposition filed within time limit [1999/45] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 26.08.1991 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 15.04.1992 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 14.05.1993 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 20.05.1994 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 19.05.1995 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 22.05.1996 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 21.05.1997 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 11.05.1998 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.05.1991 | 03   M06   Fee paid on   26.08.1991 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | EP0130523 [ ] (MOLECULAR DIAGNOSTICS INC [US]); | EP0142299 [ ] (FUJIREBIO KK [JP]) | [ ] - Proceedings of the National Academy of Sciences USA, Vol. 81, April 1984, (Washington, D.C., US), G.M. CHURCH et al.: "Genomic Sequencing", pages 1991-1995 | [ ] - Tetrahedron Letters, Vol. 22, No. 34, 1981, Pergamon Press Ltd (GB), I. SAITO et al.: "Photochemical ring Opening of Thymidine and Thymine in the Presence of Primary Amines", pages 3265-3268 | [ ] - Nucleic Acids Research, Vol. 14, No. 24, 1986, IRL Press Ltd (Oxford, GB), H.B. GAMPER et al.: "Reverse Southern Hybridization", pages 9943-9954 |