EP0416035 - AMPHIPHILIC PEPTIDES AND USE THEREOF [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 12.10.1995 Database last updated on 27.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 23.12.1999 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): LU | published on 09.02.2000 [2000/06] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states The Children's Hospital of Philadelphia 34th Street & Civic Center Boulevard Philadelphia, PA 19104 / US | [N/P] |
Former [1992/40] | For all designated states THE CHILDREN'S HOSPITAL OF PHILADELPHIA 34th Street & Civic Center Boulevard Philadelphia, PA 19104 / US | ||
Former [1991/11] | For all designated states MAGAININ SCIENCES, INC. 5110 Campus Drive Plymouth Meeting PA 19462 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
ZASLOFF, Michael 274 Linden Lane Merion Station, PA 19066 / US | [1991/11] | Representative(s) | Louis Pöhlau Lohrentz Patentanwälte Postfach 30 55 90014 Nürnberg / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1991/11] | LOUIS, PÖHLAU, LOHRENTZ & SEGETH Postfach 3055 D-90014 Nürnberg / DE | Application number, filing date | 89907441.3 | 19.05.1989 | [1991/11] | WO1989US02217 | Priority number, date | US19880199927 | 27.05.1988 Original published format: US 199927 | [1991/11] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO8911290 | Date: | 30.11.1989 | Language: | EN | [1989/28] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0416035 | Date: | 13.03.1991 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 30.11.1989 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1991/11] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0416035 | Date: | 07.12.1994 | Language: | EN | [1994/49] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 30.11.1989 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 25.11.1991 | Classification | IPC: | C07K7/06, A61K37/02, C07K7/08, C07K7/10 | [1994/49] | CPC: |
C07K7/06 (EP);
A61K38/00 (EP,KR);
A61P31/04 (EP);
A61P31/12 (EP);
A61P35/00 (EP);
C07K14/46 (EP);
|
Former IPC [1991/11] | A61K37/02, C07K7/06, C07K7/08, C07K7/10 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, FR, GB, IT, LI, LU, NL, SE [1991/11] | Title | German: | AMPHIPHILE PEPTIDE UND DEREN VERWENDUNG | [1994/49] | English: | AMPHIPHILIC PEPTIDES AND USE THEREOF | [1991/11] | French: | PEPTIDES AMPHIPHILIQUES ET LEUR UTILISATION | [1991/11] |
Former [1991/11] | AMPHIPHITE PEPTIDE UND DEREN VERWENDUNG | Entry into regional phase | 23.11.1990 | National basic fee paid | 23.11.1990 | Search fee paid | 23.11.1990 | Designation fee(s) paid | 23.11.1990 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 20.12.1989 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: DE | 23.11.1990 | Examination requested [1991/11] | 02.06.1993 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 05.10.1993 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 26.11.1993 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 29.03.1994 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 11.05.1994 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 08.06.1994 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 02.09.1994 | Fee for grant paid | 02.09.1994 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 08.09.1995 | No opposition filed within time limit [1995/48] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 23.11.1990 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 08.04.1992 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 12.05.1993 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 20.04.1994 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 19.05.1995 | GB | 19.05.1995 | SE | 20.05.1995 | BE | 31.05.1995 | CH | 31.05.1995 | LI | 31.05.1995 | LU | 31.05.1995 | [2000/06] |
Former [1997/13] | AT | 19.05.1995 | |
GB | 19.05.1995 | ||
SE | 20.05.1995 | ||
BE | 31.05.1995 | ||
CH | 31.05.1995 | ||
LI | 31.05.1995 | ||
Former [1996/42] | AT | 19.05.1995 | |
GB | 19.05.1995 | ||
SE | 20.05.1995 | ||
BE | 31.05.1995 | ||
Former [1996/22] | GB | 19.05.1995 | |
SE | 20.05.1995 | ||
BE | 31.05.1995 | ||
Former [1996/15] | GB | 19.05.1995 | |
SE | 20.05.1995 | ||
Former [1996/11] | SE | 20.05.1995 | Cited in | International search | [A]US4107298 (LUNING BJORN ERIK GUSTAV BERTI); | [A]US4617149 (DIMARCHI RICHARD D [US], et al); | [A]US4636489 (SEEMUELLER URSULA [DE], et al); | [A]US4659692 (LEHRER ROBERT I [US], et al); | [A]US4668662 (TRIPIER DOMINIQUE [DE]); | [AP]US4791100 (KRAMER MARTIN [DE], et al) | Examination | WO8806597 | - Protein Engineering (1987), pages 193-199, Alan R. Lyss Inc. |