EP0422074 - TELEVISION BROADCAST SYSTEM FOR SELECTIVE TRANSMISSION OF VIEWER-CHOSEN PROGRAMS AT VIEWER-REQUESTED TIMES [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 08.08.1995 Database last updated on 24.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 08.08.1995 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 27.09.1995 [1995/39] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states MONSLOW, H. Vincent 11815 Rosehill Road Overland Park, KS 66210 / US | [1991/16] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
MONSLOW, H., Vincent 11815 Rosehill Road Overland Park, KS 66210 / US | 02 /
DICKEY, Steven, R. 2009 West 103rd Street Leawood, KS 66206 / US | [1991/16] | Representative(s) | Uexküll & Stolberg Partnerschaft von Patent- und Rechtsanwälten mbB Beselerstrasse 4 22607 Hamburg / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1991/16] | UEXKÜLL & STOLBERG Patentanwälte Beselerstrasse 4 D-22607 Hamburg / DE | Application number, filing date | 89907549.3 | 08.06.1989 | [1991/16] | WO1989US02507 | Priority number, date | US19880204585 | 09.06.1988 Original published format: US 204585 | [1991/16] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO8912370 | Date: | 14.12.1989 | Language: | EN | [1989/29] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0422074 | Date: | 17.04.1991 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 14.12.1989 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1991/16] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 14.12.1989 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 14.05.1992 | Classification | IPC: | H04N7/167 | [1991/16] | CPC: |
H04N7/17318 (EP,US);
H04N2007/1739 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, FR, GB, IT, LI, LU, NL, SE [1991/16] | Title | German: | FERNSEHRUNDFUNKSYSTEM ZUR SELEKTIVEN ÜBERTRAGUNG VON DURCH FERNSEHRZUSCHAUER AUSGEWÄHLTEN PROGRAMMEN ZU DURCH FERNSEHZUSCHAUER VERLANGTEN ZEITEN | [1991/16] | English: | TELEVISION BROADCAST SYSTEM FOR SELECTIVE TRANSMISSION OF VIEWER-CHOSEN PROGRAMS AT VIEWER-REQUESTED TIMES | [1991/16] | French: | SYSTEME EMETTEUR DE TELEVISION POUR LA TRANSMISSION SELECTIVE DE PROGRAMMES CHOISIS PAR LES TELESPECTATEURS, A DES HEURES DEMANDEES PAR LES TELESPECTATEURS | [1991/16] | File destroyed: | 03.03.2001 | Entry into regional phase | 05.12.1990 | National basic fee paid | 05.12.1990 | Search fee paid | 05.12.1990 | Designation fee(s) paid | 05.12.1990 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 04.01.1990 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: DE | 05.12.1990 | Examination requested [1991/16] | 18.08.1994 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 20.12.1994 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 31.03.1995 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [1995/39] | 03.05.1995 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: fee for grant / fee for printing not paid in time [1995/39] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 27.05.1991 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 17.08.1992 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 14.07.1993 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 07.12.1994 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.06.1992 | 04   M06   Fee paid on   17.08.1992 | 30.06.1993 | 05   M06   Fee paid on   14.07.1993 | 30.06.1994 | 06   M06   Fee paid on   07.12.1994 | 30.06.1995 | 07   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [A]US4251691 (KAKIHARA HIDETO, et al); | [Y]US4381522 (LAMBERT TREVOR); | [A]US4710955 (KAUFFMAN MARC W [US]); | [AP]US4761684 (CLARK MORRIS [US], et al); | [YP]US4763191 (GORDON TRAVIS H [US], et al); | [AP]US4785472 (SHAPIRO ARTHUR [US]); | [YP]US4792849 (MCCALLEY KARL W [US], et al) |