EP0438413 - HUMIDITY CONTROL SYSTEM FOR A SCALE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 06.01.1994 Database last updated on 02.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 06.01.1994 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 23.02.1994 [1994/08] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states SETRA SYSTEMS, INC. 45 Nagog Park Acton, MA 01720 / US | [1991/31] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
LI, Da, Ke 3 Simon Willard Road Acton, MA 01720 / US | [1991/31] | Representative(s) | Attfield, Donald James, et al BROOKES, MARTIN & WILSON Prudential Buildings 5 St. Philip's Place Birmingham B3 2AF / GB | [1991/31] | Application number, filing date | 89907566.7 | 12.06.1989 | [1991/31] | WO1989US02547 | Priority number, date | US19880256493 | 12.10.1988 Original published format: US 256493 | [1991/31] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9004153 | Date: | 19.04.1990 | Language: | EN | [1990/09] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0438413 | Date: | 31.07.1991 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 19.04.1990 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1991/31] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0438413 | Date: | 03.03.1993 | Language: | EN | [1993/09] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 19.04.1990 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 10.09.1991 | Classification | IPC: | G01G7/06, G01G23/00 | [1991/46] | CPC: |
G01G23/00 (EP,US);
G01G7/06 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [1991/31] | G01G3/14 | Designated contracting states | CH, DE, FR, GB, LI [1991/31] | Title | German: | FEUCHTIGKEITSREGELUNGSSYSTEM FÜR EINE WAAGE | [1991/31] | English: | HUMIDITY CONTROL SYSTEM FOR A SCALE | [1991/31] | French: | SYSTEME DE REGULATION D'HUMIDITE POUR UNE BALANCE | [1991/31] | Entry into regional phase | 08.04.1991 | National basic fee paid | 08.04.1991 | Search fee paid | 08.04.1991 | Designation fee(s) paid | 08.04.1991 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 20.03.1990 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: DE | 08.04.1991 | Examination requested [1991/31] | 24.04.1992 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: No) | 21.08.1992 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: later approval) | 27.08.1992 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 21.09.1992 | Fee for grant paid | 21.09.1992 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 04.12.1993 | No opposition filed within time limit [1994/08] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 21.06.1991 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 18.05.1992 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]CH409439 (KELLER MAX [CH]) | International search | [A]US4416343 (KNOTHE ERICH [DE], et al); | [A]US4448085 (LEE SHIH-YING [US]); | [A]US4548288 (KOMOTO AKIRA [JP]); | [Y]US4623030 (PORTMAN JR JOE L [US], et al); | [A]US4666007 (KNOTHE ERICH [DE], et al) |