EP0425530 - CLOSURE DEVICE FOR DRAINPIPES [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 03.08.1993 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 30.11.2007 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state Updated state(s): FR | published on 02.01.2008 [2008/01] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states SION, Karl Halfendriesch 4 D-52080 Aachen / DE | For all designated states WIRTZ, Dieter Krebsstrasse 74 D-52080 Aachen / DE | [1991/19] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
see applicant ... | [1991/19] | Representative(s) | von Creytz, Dietrich Tannenweg 25 41844 Wegberg / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1991/19] | von Creytz, Dietrich, Dipl.-Phys. Tannenweg 25 D-41844 Wegberg / DE | Application number, filing date | 89907666.5 | 07.07.1989 | [1991/19] | WO1989DE00447 | Priority number, date | DE19883823556 | 12.07.1988 Original published format: DE 3823556 | DE19893900133 | 04.01.1989 Original published format: DE 3900133 | DE19890000674U | 23.01.1989 Original published format: DE 8900674 U | [1991/19] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9000652 | Date: | 25.01.1990 | Language: | DE | [1990/03] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0425530 | Date: | 08.05.1991 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 25.01.1990 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1991/19] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0425530 | Date: | 30.09.1992 | Language: | DE | [1992/40] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 25.01.1990 | Classification | IPC: | E03F7/02, F16K7/10 | [1991/19] | CPC: |
F16L55/134 (EP,US);
E03F7/02 (EP,US);
F16K7/10 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, FR, GB, IT, LI, LU, NL, SE [1991/19] | Title | German: | ABSPERRVORRICHTUNG FÜR ABFLUSSKANÄLE | [1991/19] | English: | CLOSURE DEVICE FOR DRAINPIPES | [1991/19] | French: | DISPOSITIF D'OBTURATION DE CANAUX D'ECOULEMENT | [1991/19] | Entry into regional phase | 29.12.1990 | National basic fee paid | 29.12.1990 | Designation fee(s) paid | 29.12.1990 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 11.01.1990 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: DE | 29.12.1990 | Examination requested [1991/19] | 04.11.1991 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 04.03.1992 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 09.04.1992 | Fee for grant paid | 09.04.1992 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 01.07.1993 | No opposition filed within time limit [1993/38] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 06.09.1991 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 21.07.1992 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.07.1991 | 03   M06   Fee paid on   06.09.1991 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | BE | 30.09.1992 | FR | 30.09.1992 | GB | 30.09.1992 | IT | 30.09.1992 | NL | 30.09.1992 | SE | 30.09.1992 | [2004/35] |
Former [1999/42] | BE | 30.09.1992 | |
GB | 30.09.1992 | ||
IT | 30.09.1992 | ||
NL | 30.09.1992 | ||
SE | 30.09.1992 | ||
FR | 19.02.1993 | ||
Former [1993/47] | BE | 30.09.1992 | |
GB | 30.09.1992 | ||
NL | 30.09.1992 | ||
SE | 30.09.1992 | ||
FR | 19.02.1993 | ||
Former [1993/33] | BE | 30.09.1992 | |
NL | 30.09.1992 | ||
SE | 30.09.1992 | ||
FR | 19.02.1993 | ||
Former [1993/21] | BE | 30.09.1992 | |
NL | 30.09.1992 | ||
SE | 30.09.1992 | ||
Former [1993/19] | BE | 30.09.1992 | |
SE | 30.09.1992 | ||
Former [1993/16] | SE | 30.09.1992 | Cited in | International search | US3870085 [ ] (SCHNEIDER MICHAEL); | US3890994 [ ] (OLSEN CHARLES R); | FR2617572 [ ] (ELECTRICITE DE FRANCE [FR]) |