EP0404853 - PROCESS FOR MANUFACTURING EXPLOSIVE CHARGES FROM NON-POURABLE MIXTURES [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 18.06.1994 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 18.06.1994 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 10.08.1994 [1994/32] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Rheinmetall GmbH Pempelfurtstrasse 1 40880 Ratingen / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1991/01] | For all designated states Rheinmetall GmbH Pempelfurtstrasse 1 D-40880 Ratingen / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
LÜBBEN, Manfred Wittingerstrasse 210a D-3100 Celle / DE | 02 /
FURCH, Benjamin Stettiner Strasse 11 D-3104 Unterlüss / DE | 03 /
PINKERNELLE, Horst Burgstrasse 14 D-3104 Unterlüss / DE | [1991/01] | Application number, filing date | 89907738.2 | 13.07.1989 | [1991/01] | WO1989EP00812 | Priority number, date | DE19883838084 | 10.11.1988 Original published format: DE 3838084 | [1991/01] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9005124 | Date: | 17.05.1990 | Language: | DE | [1990/11] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0404853 | Date: | 02.01.1991 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 17.05.1990 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1991/01] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0404853 | Date: | 18.08.1993 | Language: | DE | [1993/33] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 17.05.1990 | Classification | IPC: | C06B21/00, C06B45/22 | [1991/01] | CPC: |
C06B21/0041 (EP);
C06B21/005 (EP);
C06B21/0083 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [1991/01] | Title | German: | VERFAHREN ZUR HERSTELLUNG VON EXPLOSIVEN LADUNGEN AUS NICHT GIESSFÄHIGEN MISCHUNGEN | [1991/01] | English: | PROCESS FOR MANUFACTURING EXPLOSIVE CHARGES FROM NON-POURABLE MIXTURES | [1991/01] | French: | PROCEDE DE FABRICATION DE CHARGES EXPLOSIVES A PARTIR DE MELANGES NON COULANTS | [1991/01] | File destroyed: | 03.03.2001 | Entry into regional phase | 26.02.1990 | National basic fee paid | 26.02.1990 | Designation fee(s) paid | 26.02.1990 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 26.02.1990 | Examination requested [1991/01] | 14.05.1992 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 19.06.1992 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 21.10.1992 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 25.01.1993 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 30.01.1993 | Fee for grant paid | 30.01.1993 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 19.05.1994 | No opposition filed within time limit [1994/32] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 07.05.1991 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 19.06.1992 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 15.06.1993 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | FR2143359 [ ] (RHEINMETALL GMBH); | DE1186383 [ ] (WASAGCHEMIE AG); | DE2122441 [ ]; | DE1646307 [ ] (WASAGCHEMIE AG); | DE2336004 [ ] (MESSERSCHMITT BOELKOW BLOHM); | US2852360 [ ] (GUSTAV BY NILS); | FR2499976 [ ] (FRANCE ETAT [FR]) |