EP0378707 - AMINOACETONITRILE DERIVATIVES [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 20.11.1993 Database last updated on 10.08.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 23.12.1999 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): LU | published on 09.02.2000 [2000/06] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states NIPPON SODA CO., LTD. 2-1, Ohtemachi 2-chome Chiyoda-ku Tokyo 100-8165 / JP | [N/P] |
Former [1990/30] | For all designated states NIPPON SODA CO., LTD. 2-1, Ohtemachi 2-chome Chiyoda-ku, Tokyo 100 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
TAZAKI, Seiji, Mizushima Plant, Nippon Soda Co. Ltd.,2767-12, Aza Niihama, Shionasu Kojima, Kurashiki-shi, Okayama / JP | 02 /
UMEDA, Nobuhiro, Odawara Research Center Nippon Soda Co., Ltd.,345, Aza Yanagimachi Takada, Odawara-shi, Kanagawa / JP | 03 /
MATSUI, Nobuo, Odawara Research Center Nippon Soda Co., Ltd.,345, Aza Yanagimachi Takada, Odawara-shi, Kanagawa / JP | 04 /
YAGIHARA, Tomio, Mizushima Plant, Nippon Soda Co. Ltd.,2767-12, Aza Niihama, Shionasu Kojima, Kurashiki-shi, Okayama / JP | 05 /
MIKUMA, Katsunori, Mizushima Plant, Nippon Soda Co., Ltd.,2767-12, Aza Niihama, Shionasu Kojima, Kurashiki-shi, Okayama / JP | [1990/30] | Representative(s) | de Bruijn, Leendert C., et al Nederlandsch Octrooibureau P.O. Box 29720 2502 LS Den Haag / NL | [N/P] |
Former [1990/30] | de Bruijn, Leendert C., et al Nederlandsch Octrooibureau P.O. Box 29720 NL-2502 LS Den Haag / NL | Application number, filing date | 89908282.0 | 05.07.1989 | [1990/30] | WO1989JP00672 | Priority number, date | JP19880167738 | 07.07.1988 Original published format: JP 16773888 | [1990/30] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9000543 | Date: | 25.01.1990 | Language: | EN | [1990/03] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0378707 | Date: | 25.07.1990 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 25.01.1990 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1990/30] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0378707 | Date: | 20.01.1993 | Language: | EN | [1993/03] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 25.01.1990 | Classification | IPC: | C07C323/62, C07C323/58, C07C323/61, C07C327/34, C07D307/38, C07D307/91, C07D333/34 | [1990/30] | CPC: |
C07D307/38 (EP);
C07C323/62 (KR);
C07C323/58 (EP);
C07D333/34 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, FR, GB, IT, LI, LU, NL, SE [1990/30] | Title | German: | AMINOACETONITRIL-DERIVATE | [1990/30] | English: | AMINOACETONITRILE DERIVATIVES | [1990/30] | French: | DERIVES D'AMINOACETONITRILE | [1990/30] | Entry into regional phase | 06.03.1990 | National basic fee paid | 06.03.1990 | Designation fee(s) paid | 06.03.1990 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 06.03.1990 | Examination requested [1990/30] | 03.06.1992 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 14.07.1992 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 08.10.1992 | Fee for grant paid | 08.10.1992 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 21.10.1993 | No opposition filed within time limit [1994/02] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 31.07.1991 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 30.07.1992 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 20.01.1993 | BE | 20.01.1993 | SE | 20.01.1993 | LU | 31.07.1993 | [2000/06] |
Former [1994/25] | AT | 20.01.1993 | |
BE | 20.01.1993 | ||
SE | 20.01.1993 | ||
Former [1993/38] | BE | 20.01.1993 | |
SE | 20.01.1993 | ||
Former [1993/32] | SE | 20.01.1993 | Cited in | International search | EP0135304 [ ] (ICI PLC [GB]); | EP0149324 [ ] (ICI PLC [GB]) |