EP0423219 - IMPROVEMENTS IN OR RELATING TO THE PREPARATION OF CIGARETTE FILLINGS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 24.02.1994 Database last updated on 24.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 24.02.1994 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 13.04.1994 [1994/15] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states GBE INTERNATIONAL PLC GBE House, Newbury Road Andover Hampshire SP10 4DW / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1991/17] | For all designated states GBE INTERNATIONAL PLC GBE House, Newbury Road Andover, Hampshire SP10 4DW / GB | Inventor(s) | 01 /
WHITE, Victor, Albert, Montgomery Delta Gray,Finmere Buckingham MK18 4AR / GB | [1991/17] | Representative(s) | Matthews, Graham Farrah, et al BROOKES & MARTIN High Holborn House 52/54 High Holborn London WC1V 6SE / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1991/17] | Matthews, Graham Farrah, et al BROOKES & MARTIN High Holborn House 52/54 High Holborn London WC1V 6SE / GB | Application number, filing date | 89908448.7 | 30.06.1989 | [1991/17] | WO1989GB00735 | Priority number, date | GB19880015607 | 30.06.1988 Original published format: GB 8815607 | [1991/17] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO9000019 | Date: | 11.01.1990 | [1990/02] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0423219 | Date: | 24.04.1991 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 11.01.1990 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1991/17] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0423219 | Date: | 21.04.1993 | Language: | EN | [1993/16] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 08.02.1990 | Classification | IPC: | A24B15/12, A24B15/30 | [1991/17] | CPC: |
A24B15/12 (EP,US);
A24B15/30 (EP,US);
A24D1/18 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, GB, IT [1991/17] | Title | German: | HERSTELLUNG VON FÜLLMASSEN FÜR ZIGARETTEN | [1991/17] | English: | IMPROVEMENTS IN OR RELATING TO THE PREPARATION OF CIGARETTE FILLINGS | [1991/17] | French: | AMELIORATIONS RELATIVES A LA PREPARATION DE GARNITURES DE CIGARETTES | [1991/17] | Entry into regional phase | 07.12.1990 | National basic fee paid | 07.12.1990 | Designation fee(s) paid | 07.12.1990 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 25.01.1990 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: DE | 07.12.1990 | Examination requested [1991/17] | 07.09.1992 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 21.10.1992 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 07.01.1993 | Fee for grant paid | 07.01.1993 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 22.01.1994 | No opposition filed within time limit [1994/15] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 22.06.1991 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 15.09.1992 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.06.1992 | 04   M06   Fee paid on   15.09.1992 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [A]FR2138951 (IMP TOBACCO GROUP LTD); | [A]GB871952 (PHILIP MORRIS INC); | [A]FR2255020 (TAMAG BASEL AG [DE]); | [X]US3867951 (BUCHMANN PAUL, et al); | [A]DE2151445 (TAMAG BASEL AG) |