EP0393200 - NC LASER APPARATUS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 20.08.1994 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 20.08.1994 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 12.10.1994 [1994/41] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states FANUC LTD 3580, Shibokusa Aza-Komanba, Oshinomura Minamitsuru-gun Yamanashi 401-05 / JP | [N/P] |
Former [1990/43] | For all designated states FANUC LTD. 3580, Shibokusa Aza-Komanba, Oshinomura Minamitsuru-gun, Yamanashi 401-05 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
IEHISA, Nobuaki Fanuc Mansion Harimomi 7-304 3539-1, Shibokusa Oshinomura Minamitsuru-gun Yamanashi 401-05 / JP | 02 /
YAMAZAKI, Etsuo 566-93, Shimoongatamachi Hachioji-shi Tokyo 192-01 / JP | [1990/43] | Representative(s) | Jackson, Peter Arthur, et al GILL JENNINGS & EVERY Broadgate House 7 Eldon Street London EC2M 7LH / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1990/43] | Jackson, Peter Arthur, et al GILL JENNINGS & EVERY Broadgate House 7 Eldon Street London EC2M 7LH / GB | Application number, filing date | 89908874.4 | 26.07.1989 | [1990/43] | WO1989JP00773 | Priority number, date | JP19880193684 | 03.08.1988 Original published format: JP 19368488 | [1990/43] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9001819 | Date: | 22.02.1990 | Language: | EN | [1990/05] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0393200 | Date: | 24.10.1990 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 22.02.1990 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1990/43] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0393200 | Date: | 20.10.1993 | Language: | EN | [1993/42] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 22.02.1990 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 06.12.1990 | Classification | IPC: | H01S3/041, H01S3/097, H01S3/10 | [1993/42] | CPC: |
H01S3/036 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [1990/43] | H01S3/04, H01S3/097, H01S3/10 | Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, IT [1990/43] | Title | German: | NUMERISCH GESTEUERTE LASERVORRICHTUNG | [1990/43] | English: | NC LASER APPARATUS | [1990/43] | French: | DISPOSITIF LASER A COMMANDE NUMERIQUE | [1990/43] | Entry into regional phase | 19.03.1990 | Translation filed | 30.04.1990 | National basic fee paid | 30.04.1990 | Search fee paid | 30.04.1990 | Designation fee(s) paid | 30.04.1990 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 30.04.1990 | Examination requested [1990/43] | 04.02.1993 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: No) | 13.04.1993 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: later approval) | 20.04.1993 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 09.07.1993 | Fee for grant paid | 09.07.1993 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 21.07.1994 | No opposition filed within time limit [1994/41] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 13.07.1991 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 09.07.1992 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 12.07.1993 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [A]JPH05687392 ; | [A]JPS61154188 (TOSHIBA CORP); | [A]JPS63273581 (FANUC LTD); | [A]JPH06255979 (FUKAHORI SHUJI) |