EP0466688 - GAP GENE SEQUENCES AND DIAGNOSTIC USES THEREOF [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 12.06.1998 Database last updated on 18.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 12.06.1998 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 29.07.1998 [1998/31] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states CHIRON CORPORATION 4560 Horton Street Emeryville CA 94608-2916 / US | [N/P] |
Former [1996/48] | For all designated states CHIRON CORPORATION 4560 Horton Street Emeryville, California 94608 / US | ||
Former [1992/36] | For all designated states CETUS ONCOLOGY CORPORATION 1400 Fifty-Third Street Emeryville California 94608 / US | ||
Former [1992/04] | For all designated states CETUS CORPORATION 1400 Fifty-Third Street Emeryville California 94608 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
WONG, Gail, L. 11255 Elvessa Street Oakland, CA 94605 / US | 02 /
MCCORMICK, Francis, P. 31 Florida Avenue Berkeley, CA 94707 / US | 03 /
MARTIN, George 2346 Woolsey Street Berkeley, CA 94705 / US | 04 /
RUBINFELD, Bonnee 3403 Claridge Drive Danville, CA 94526 / US | 05 /
O'ROURKE, Edward, C. 4414 Province Line Road Princeton, NJ 08540 / US | 06 /
CLARK, Robin 7081 Colton Bld Oakland, CA 94611 / US | 07 /
KOTHS, Kirston, E. 2646 Mira Vista Drive El Cerrito, CA 94530 / US | 08 /
HALENBECK, Robert, F. 136 Spring Grove Avenue San Rafael, CA 94901 / US | 09 /
TRAHEY, Mary, M. 137 Atlantic Avenue San Carlos, CA 94070 / US | [1992/22] |
Former [1992/04] | 01 /
WONG, Gail, L. 11255 Elvessa Street Oakland, CA 94605 / US | ||
02 /
MCCORMICK, Francis, P. 921 Ramona Avenue Albany, CA 94706 / US | |||
03 /
MARTIN, George 2346 Woolsey Street Berkeley, CA 94705 / US | |||
04 /
RUBINFELD, Bonnee 3403 Claridge Drive Danville, CA 94526 / US | |||
05 /
O'ROURKE, Edward, C. 7321 Skyline Boulevard Oakland, CA 94611 / US | |||
06 /
CLARK, Robin 3736 Woodruff Avenue Oakland, CA 94602 / US | |||
07 /
KOTHS, Kirston, E. 2646 Mira Vista Drive El Cerrito, CA 94530 / US | |||
08 /
HALENBECK, Robert, F. 136 Spring Grove Avenue San Rafael, CA 94901 / US | |||
09 /
TRAHEY, Mary, M. 5933 Chabot Road Oakland, CA 94618 / US | Representative(s) | Bizley, Richard Edward, et al Avidity IP Broers Building Hauser Forum 21 J J Thomson Ave Cambridge CB3 0FA / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1992/04] | Bizley, Richard Edward, et al Hepworth, Lawrence, Bryer & Bizley Merlin House Falconry Court Bakers Lane Epping Essex CM16 5DQ / GB | Application number, filing date | 89908913.0 | 23.06.1989 | [1992/04] | WO1989US02761 | Priority number, date | US19880216888 | 08.07.1988 Original published format: US 216888 | US19880230761 | 10.08.1988 Original published format: US 230761 | US19880260807 | 21.10.1988 Original published format: US 260807 | [1992/04] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO9000607 | Date: | 25.01.1990 | [1990/03] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0466688 | Date: | 22.01.1992 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 25.01.1990 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1992/04] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0466688 | Date: | 06.08.1997 | Language: | EN | [1997/32] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 01.11.1990 | Classification | IPC: | C12N15/12, C12N15/86, C12P21/02, C07K14/00, C12Q1/68, C12Q1/42 | [1997/32] | CPC: |
G01N33/573 (EP);
C07K14/4703 (EP);
C07K14/4706 (EP);
C07K16/30 (EP);
G01N33/5011 (EP);
G01N33/57496 (EP);
|
Former IPC [1992/04] | C12N15/12, C12N15/86, C12P21/02, C07K13/00, C12Q1/68, C12Q1/42 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, FR, GB, IT, LI, LU, NL, SE [1992/04] | Title | German: | GAP-GEN-SEQUENZEN UND DIAGNOSEVERWENDUNGEN DAVON | [1992/04] | English: | GAP GENE SEQUENCES AND DIAGNOSTIC USES THEREOF | [1992/04] | French: | SEQUENCES DE GENES DE GAP ET UTILISATIONS DIAGNOSTIQUES DE TELLES SEQUENCES | [1992/04] | Miscellaneous | EPB 1994/42: Teilanmeldung 94111922.4 eingereicht am 23/06/89 | EPB 1994/42: Divisional application 94111922.4 filed on 23/06/89 | EPB 1994/42: Demande divisionnaire 94111922.4 déposée le 23/06/89 | Entry into regional phase | 12.02.1991 | National basic fee paid | 12.02.1991 | Designation fee(s) paid | 12.02.1991 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 10.01.1990 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: DE | 12.02.1991 | Examination requested [1992/04] | 17.09.1993 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 28.04.1994 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time | 05.07.1994 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 19.01.1995 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 28.07.1995 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 01.04.1996 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: No) | 04.11.1996 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: later approval) | 12.11.1996 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 02.01.1997 | Fee for grant paid | 02.01.1997 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | EP94111922.4 / EP0649908 | Opposition(s) | 07.05.1998 | No opposition filed within time limit [1998/31] | Request for further processing for: | 05.07.1994 | Request for further processing filed | 05.07.1994 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 29.07.1994 | Decision despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 27.05.1991 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 18.05.1992 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 27.05.1993 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 27.05.1994 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 26.05.1995 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 28.05.1996 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 27.05.1997 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | Penalty fee | Penalty fee Rule 85b EPC 1973 | 11.02.1991 | M01   Fee paid on   12.02.1991 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [ ] - Science, Volume 238, 23 Oktober 1987, (Washington, DC, US), M. TRAHEY et al.: "A Cytoplasmic Protein Stimulates Normal N-Ras P21 GRPase, but does not affect Oncogenic Mutants", pages 542-545 | [ ] - Science, Volume 240, 22 April 1988, (Washington, DC, US), H. ADARI et al9: "Guanosine Triphosphatase Activating Protein (GAP) Interacts with the P21 Ras Effector Binding Domain", pages 518-521 | [ ] - Nature, Volume 332, 7 April 1988, (London, GB), C. CALES et al.: "The Cytoplasmic Protein GAP is Implicated as the Target for Regulation by the ras Gene Product", pages 548-551 | [ ] - Science, Volume 242, 23 December 1988, (Washington, DC, US), M. TRAHEY et al.: "Molecular Cloning of two types of GAP Complementary DNA from Human Placenta", pages 1697-1700 | [ ] - Nature, Volume 335, 1 September 1988, (London, GB), U.S. VOGEL et al.: "Cloning of Bovine GAP and its Interaction with Oncogenic Ras p21", pages 90-93 | [ ] - Biochemical and Biophysical Research Communications, Volume 159, No. 3, 31 March 1989, Academic Press, Inc., (Duluth, Mn, US), T. UEDA et al.: "GTPase Activating Proteins from the Smg-21 GTP-Binding Protein Having the Same Effector Domain as the Ras Proteins in Human Platelets", pages 1411-1419 | [ ] - Cancer Research, Volume 49, 15 March 1989, (Philadelphia, PA, US), C. DUANMU et al.: "Tubilin-Dependent Hydrolysis of Guanosine Triphosphate as a Screening Test to Identify New Antitubulin Compounds with Potential as Antimitotic Agents: Application to Carbamates of Aromatic Amines", pages 1344-1348 | Examination | - Cytoplasmic Protein GAP is Implicated as the Target for Regulation by the ras Gene Product", pages 548-551 | - Cancer Research, Volume 49, 15 March 1989, (Philadelphia, PA, US), C. DUANMU et al.: "Tubilin-Dependent Hydrolysis of Guanosine Triphosphate as a Screening Test to Identify New Antitubulin Compounds with Potential as Antimitotic Agents: Application to Carbamates of Aromatic Amines", pages 1344-1348 |