EP0428578 - GENERAL PURPOSE HOUSEHOLD ADHESIVE BASED ON POLYURETHANE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Request for examination was made Status updated on 12.04.1991 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 20.06.1991 | Change - miscellaneous | published on 07.08.1991 [1991/32] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Henkel Kommanditgesellschaft auf Aktien 40191 Düsseldorf / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1991/22] | For all designated states Henkel Kommanditgesellschaft auf Aktien D-40191 Düsseldorf / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
HÖFER, Rainer Klever Strasse 31 D-4000 Düsseldorf 13 / DE | 02 /
GIERENZ, Gerhard Dieselstrasse 80 D-5650 Solingen 19 / DE | 03 /
KLAUCK, Wolfgang Gelvenweg 2 D-4005 Meerbusch 2 / DE | 04 /
GRÜTZMACHER, Roland Heinrich-Heine-Strasse 2 D-5603 Wülfrath / DE | [1991/22] | Application number, filing date | 89908989.0 | 03.08.1989 | [1991/22] | WO1989EP00915 | Priority number, date | DE19883827378 | 12.08.1988 Original published format: DE 3827378 | [1991/22] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9001508 | Date: | 22.02.1990 | Language: | DE | [1990/05] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0428578 | Date: | 29.05.1991 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 22.02.1990 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1991/22] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 22.02.1990 | Classification | IPC: | C08G18/48, C08G18/08, C09J175/08 | [1991/22] | CPC: |
C08G18/4854 (EP);
C08G18/48 (KR);
C08G18/0804 (EP);
C09J175/08 (EP);
C08G2170/80 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, FR, GB, IT, LI, LU, NL, SE [1991/22] | Title | German: | HAUSHALTSALLESKLEBER AUF POLYURETHANBASIS | [1991/22] | English: | GENERAL PURPOSE HOUSEHOLD ADHESIVE BASED ON POLYURETHANE | [1991/22] | French: | COLLE UNIVERSELLE DE MENAGE A BASE DE POLYURETHANE | [1991/22] | Miscellaneous | EPB 1991/32: Verfahren abgeschlossen infolge Verbindung mit 89114337.2/0354471 (europäische Anmeldenummer/Veröffentlichungsnummer) vom 25.06.91 | EPB 1991/32: Proceedings concluded following consolidation with 89114337.2/0354471 (European application No./publication No.) by decision dated 25.06.91 | EPB 1991/32: Procédure close par suite de la jonction avec la demande no. 89114337.2/0354471 (numéro de dépôt/numéro de publication de la demande européenne) par décision du 25.06.91 | Entry into regional phase | 05.12.1990 | National basic fee paid | 05.12.1990 | Designation fee(s) paid | 05.12.1990 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 22.12.1989 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: DE | 05.12.1990 | Examination requested [1991/22] |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | by applicant | DE880485 | DE1044404 | US3036998 | DE1178586 | DE1184946 | DE1237306 | GB1067788 | DE1495847 | DE1495745 | DE1595602 | US3479310 | DE2019324 | DE1770068 | DE2035732 | DE2260870 | DE2311635 | DE2344135 | DE2345256 | DE2427274 | DE2446440 | DE3603996 |