EP0462104 - APPARATUS AND METHOD FOR SELECTIVELY FORMING A THICKENED EDGE ON A PLATE OF FORMABLE MATERIAL [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 07.03.1997 Database last updated on 15.06.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 11.07.2008 | Change - representative | published on 13.08.2008 [2008/33] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states CATERPILLAR INC. 100 N.E. Adams Street Peoria IL 61629-6490 / US | [N/P] |
Former [1991/52] | For all designated states CATERPILLAR INC. 100 Northeast Adams Street Peoria Illinois 61629-6490 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
BLUNIER, Dennis, L. Rural Route 2 P.O. Box 162A Danvers, IL 61732 / US | 02 /
SHANKWITZ, Phillip, J. 4227 Avent Ferry Road #4 Raleigh, N.C. 27606 / US | 03 /
CAUDILL, Maurice, L. 600 W. Melbourne Avenue Peoria, IL 61604 / US | 04 /
BOWAR, Ronald, C. 5015 E. Vermillion Chillicothe, IL 61523 / US | 05 /
AUSSIEKER, Dwight, E. Rural Route 1, Box 131 Varna, IL 61375 / US | [1992/19] |
Former [1991/52] | 01 /
BLUNIER, Dennis, L. Rural Route 2 P.O. Box 162A Danvers, IL 61732 / US | ||
02 /
SHANKWITZ, Phillip, J. 6358 North Allen Rd. 40 Peoria, IL 61614 / US | |||
03 /
CAUDILL, Maurice, L. 600 W. Melbourne Avenue Peoria, IL 61604 / US | |||
04 /
BOWAR, Ronald, C. 5015 E. Vermillion Chillicothe, IL 61523 / US | |||
05 /
AUSSIEKER, Dwight, E. Rural Route 1, Box 131 Varna, IL 61375 / US | Representative(s) | Wagner, Karl H. Wagner & Geyer Partnerschaft mbB Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Gewürzmühlstrasse 5 80538 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2008/33] | Wagner, Karl H. Wagner & Geyer Partnerschaft Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Gewürzmühlstrasse 5 80538 München / DE | ||
Former [1994/11] | Wagner, Karl H. WAGNER & GEYER Patentanwälte Gewürzmühlstrasse 5 D-80538 München / DE | ||
Former [1991/52] | Wagner, Karl H. WAGNER & GEYER Patentanwälte Gewuerzmuehlstrasse 5 D-80538 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 89909498.1 | 11.08.1989 | [1991/52] | WO1989US03435 | Priority number, date | US19890354187 | 19.05.1989 Original published format: US 354187 | [1991/52] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9014178 | Date: | 29.11.1990 | Language: | EN | [1990/27] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0462104 | Date: | 27.12.1991 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 29.11.1990 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1991/52] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0462104 | Date: | 01.05.1996 | Language: | EN | [1996/18] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 29.11.1990 | Classification | IPC: | B21D19/04 | [1991/52] | CPC: |
B21D19/005 (EP,US);
B21B1/08 (EP,US);
B21B1/224 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | BE, DE, FR, GB, IT, SE [1991/52] | Title | German: | VORRICHTUNG UND VERFAHREN ZUR SELEKTIVEN VERFORMUNG EINES DICKEN RANDES EINER PLATTE AUS VERFORMBAREM MATERIAL | [1991/52] | English: | APPARATUS AND METHOD FOR SELECTIVELY FORMING A THICKENED EDGE ON A PLATE OF FORMABLE MATERIAL | [1991/52] | French: | APPAREIL ET PROCEDE POUR FORMER SELECTIVEMENT UN BORD EPAISSI SUR UNE PLAQUE DE MATIERE FORMABLE | [1991/52] | Entry into regional phase | 18.09.1991 | National basic fee paid | 18.09.1991 | Designation fee(s) paid | 18.09.1991 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 05.10.1990 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: DE | 18.09.1991 | Examination requested [1991/52] | 04.11.1991 | Request for accelerated examination filed | 28.02.1992 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 28.02.1992 | Decision about request for accelerated examination - accepted: Yes | 02.03.1992 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M08) | 17.09.1993 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 31.01.1994 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 10.08.1994 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 31.08.1994 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M02) | 04.11.1994 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 31.05.1995 | Date of oral proceedings | 13.06.1995 | Minutes of oral proceedings despatched | 28.06.1995 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 27.09.1995 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 25.01.1996 | Fee for grant paid | 25.01.1996 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 13.02.1996 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: fee for grant / fee for printing not paid in time | Opposition(s) | 04.02.1997 | No opposition filed within time limit [1997/17] | Request for further processing for: | 16.02.1996 | Request for further processing filed | 16.02.1996 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 07.03.1996 | Decision despatched | 01.03.1993 | Request for further processing filed | 01.03.1993 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request deemed not to be filed | 28.09.1993 | Decision despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 18.09.1991 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 15.07.1992 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 03.07.1993 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 07.07.1994 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 27.06.1995 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [A]FR2063264 ; | [A]DE1602452 ; | [A]DE3022691 (SUNDWIGER EISEN MASCHINEN [DE]) |