EP0403599 - SCROLL FLUID DEVICE PROVIDED WITH SYNCHRONIZING AND UNLOADING MEANS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [1990/52] | SYNCHRONIZING AND UNLOADING SYSTEM FOR SCROLL FLUID DEVICE | ||
[1993/50] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 20.10.1994 Database last updated on 10.08.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 27.06.2008 | Change - representative | published on 30.07.2008 [2008/31] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states ARTHUR D. LITTLE, INC. 20 Acorn Park Cambridge Massachusetts 02140-2390 / US | [N/P] |
Former [1990/52] | For all designated states ARTHUR D. LITTLE, INC. 20 Acorn Park Cambridge, Massachusetts 02140-2390 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
McCULLOUGH, John, E. 413 Brook Street Carlisle, MA 01741 / US | [1990/52] | Representative(s) | Warren, Anthony Robert, et al Baron Warren Redfern Cambridge House 100 Cambridge Grove Hammersmith London W6 0LE / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2008/31] | Warren, Anthony Robert, et al Baron warren Redfern 19 South End Kensington London W8 5BU / GB | ||
Former [1990/52] | Warren, Anthony Robert, et al BARON & WARREN 18 South End Kensington London W8 5BU / GB | Application number, filing date | 89909970.9 | 02.08.1989 | [1990/52] | WO1989US03340 | Priority number, date | US19880234098 | 19.08.1988 Original published format: US 234098 | [1990/52] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9002248 | Date: | 08.03.1990 | Language: | EN | [1990/06] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0403599 | Date: | 27.12.1990 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 08.03.1990 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1990/52] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0403599 | Date: | 15.12.1993 | Language: | EN | [1993/50] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 08.03.1990 | Classification | IPC: | F01C1/02, F01C17/02 | [1990/52] | CPC: |
F01C20/22 (EP,US);
F01C1/023 (EP,US);
F01C17/02 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, IT [1990/52] | Title | German: | SPIRALFÖRMIGE FLUIDUMVERDRÄNGERMASCHINE MIT SYNCHRONISIERUNGS- UND ENTLASTUNGSEINRICHTUNG | [1993/50] | English: | SCROLL FLUID DEVICE PROVIDED WITH SYNCHRONIZING AND UNLOADING MEANS | [1993/50] | French: | DISPOSITIF HYDRAULIQUE A SPIRALE AVEC DISPOSITIF DE SYNCHRONISATION ET DE DECHARGEMENT | [1993/50] |
Former [1990/52] | SYNCHRONISIERUNG UND ENTLASTUNGSSYSTEM FÜR EINE SPIRALFÖRMIGE FLUIDUMVERDRÄGERMASCHINE | ||
Former [1990/52] | SYNCHRONIZING AND UNLOADING SYSTEM FOR SCROLL FLUID DEVICE | ||
Former [1990/52] | SYSTEME DE SYNCHRONISATION ET DE DECHARGEMENT POUR DISPOSITIF HYDRAULIQUE A SPIRALE | Entry into regional phase | 08.05.1990 | National basic fee paid | 08.05.1990 | Designation fee(s) paid | 31.08.1990 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 31.08.1990 | Examination requested [1990/52] | 08.10.1991 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 20.05.1992 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time | 11.07.1992 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 05.02.1993 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: No) | 08.06.1993 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: later approval) | 15.06.1993 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 16.07.1993 | Fee for grant paid | 16.07.1993 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 16.09.1994 | No opposition filed within time limit [1994/49] | Request for further processing for: | 11.07.1992 | Request for further processing filed | 11.07.1992 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 29.07.1992 | Decision despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 16.08.1991 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 20.08.1992 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 25.08.1993 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | JP57212303 [ ]; | JP5560684 [ ]; | US4795323 [ ] (LESSIE STEPHEN L [US]); | US4610610 [ ] (BLAIN EDWARD S [US]); | US4457675 [ ] (INAGAKI MITSUKANE [JP], et al); | DE3525616 [ ] (PIERBURG GMBH & CO KG [DE]) | [ ] - PATENTS ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, Vol. 7, No. 71 (M-202) (1216), 24 March 1983; & JP-A-57212303 (Matsushita Reiki K.K.) 27 December 1982, & JP57212303 A 19821227 | [ ] - PATENTS ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, Vol. 4, No. 102 (M-22) (584), 22 July 1980; & JP-A-5560684 (Hitachi) 7 May 1980, & JP5560684 A 19800507 |