EP0396764 - INTRAORAL SANITARY DEVICE HAVING CONTINUOUSLY BENDABLE AND SETTABLE HANDLE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 26.02.1992 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 26.02.1992 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 15.04.1992 [1992/16] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states UEHARA, Hayao 40-16 Higashikanamachi 4-chome, Katsushika-ku Tokyo 125 / JP | For all designated states UEHARA, Yasushi 40-16 Higashikanamachi 4-chome, Katsushika-ku Tokyo 125 / JP | [1990/46] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
see applicant ... | [1990/46] | Representative(s) | Popp, Eugen Meissner Bolte Patentanwälte Rechtsanwälte Partnerschaft mbB Widenmayerstrasse 47 80538 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1990/46] | Popp, Eugen, Dr. MEISSNER, BOLTE & PARTNER Widenmayerstrasse 48 D-80538 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 89910665.2 | 20.09.1989 | [1990/46] | WO1989JP00952 | Priority number, date | JP19880125303U | 26.09.1988 Original published format: JP 12530388 U | [1991/45] |
Former [1990/46] | deleted | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9003129 | Date: | 05.04.1990 | Language: | EN | [1990/08] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0396764 | Date: | 14.11.1990 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 05.04.1990 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1990/46] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 05.04.1990 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 13.08.1991 | Classification | IPC: | A46B5/00 | [1990/46] | CPC: |
A46B5/00 (KR);
A46B5/0075 (EP);
A46B5/0083 (EP);
A46B2200/1066 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, FR, GB, IT, LI, LU, NL, SE [1990/46] | Title | German: | INTRAORALE SANITÄRANORDNUNG MIT KONTINUIERLICH FALTBAREM UND VERSTELLBAREM GRIFF | [1990/46] | English: | INTRAORAL SANITARY DEVICE HAVING CONTINUOUSLY BENDABLE AND SETTABLE HANDLE | [1990/46] | French: | DISPOSITIF SANITAIRE INTRAORAL POURVU D'UN MANCHE PLIABLE ET REGLABLE EN CONTINU | [1990/46] | File destroyed: | 28.02.2000 | Entry into regional phase | 25.05.1990 | Translation filed | 25.05.1990 | National basic fee paid | 25.05.1990 | Search fee paid | 25.05.1990 | Designation fee(s) paid | 28.09.1990 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 28.09.1990 | Examination requested [1990/48] | 05.11.1991 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [1992/16] | 18.11.1991 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [1992/16] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 27.09.1991 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [Y]JPS6347727U ; | [Y]JPS6313025U ; | [Y]JPS5476864U ; | [Y]JPS4716666U ; | [Y]JPS5847887Y |