EP0440678 - METHOD FOR HEATING AND/OR COOLING AIR SUPPLIED INTO A BUILDING [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 14.03.1994 Database last updated on 28.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 14.03.1994 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 04.05.1994 [1994/18] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states GIVENT ROGER ERICSSON AB Kungsgatan 36 S-902 45 Umea / SE | [1991/33] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
ERICSSON, Roger F gelvägen 5 S-913 00 Holmsund / SE | [1991/33] | Representative(s) | Wiklund, Erik AWAPATENT AB, Box 5117 200 71 Malmö / SE | [N/P] |
Former [1991/33] | Wiklund, Erik AWAPATENT AB, Box 5117 S-200 71 Malmö / SE | Application number, filing date | 89910953.2 | 04.10.1989 | [1991/33] | WO1989SE00544 | Priority number, date | SE19880003536 | 05.10.1988 Original published format: SE 8803536 | [1991/33] | Filing language | SV | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9004135 | Date: | 19.04.1990 | Language: | EN | [1990/09] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0440678 | Date: | 14.08.1991 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 19.04.1990 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1991/33] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | SE | 19.04.1990 | Classification | IPC: | F24D11/00, F24F7/00, E04B9/04, E04B5/48 | [1991/33] | CPC: |
F24D5/10 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, FR, GB, IT, LI, NL, SE [1991/33] | Title | German: | VERFAHREN ZUR HEIZUNG UND/ODER KÜHLUNG DER AN EIN GEBÄUDE ZUGEFÜHRTEN LUFT | [1991/33] | English: | METHOD FOR HEATING AND/OR COOLING AIR SUPPLIED INTO A BUILDING | [1991/33] | French: | PROCEDE SERVANT A CHAUFFER ET/OU A REFROIDIR L'AIR ALIMENTANT UN BATIMENT | [1991/33] | File destroyed: | 15.01.2000 | Entry into regional phase | 24.04.1990 | Translation filed | 04.04.1991 | National basic fee paid | 04.04.1991 | Designation fee(s) paid | 04.04.1991 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 04.05.1990 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: DE | 04.04.1991 | Examination requested [1991/33] | 11.06.1993 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 22.10.1993 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [1994/18] | 30.11.1993 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [1994/18] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 23.04.1992 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 26.04.1993 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.10.1991 | 03   M06   Fee paid on   23.04.1992 | 02.11.1992 | 04   M06   Fee paid on   26.04.1993 | 31.10.1993 | 05   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [Y]SE316883 ; | [Y]SE441200 | [Y] - GUNNAR ANDERLIND et al "Dynamisk isolering Rapport R162", 1980, Byggforskningsradet, Stockholmsee page 55; page 59 - page 61. |