EP0394401 - DEVICE FOR CONNECTING TWO ROAD SECTION SEPARATED BY AN EXPANSION JOINT [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 27.05.1993 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 27.05.1993 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 14.07.1993 [1993/28] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states CONVERSY, François 191, boulevard Péreire F-75017 Paris / FR | [1990/44] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
see applicant ... | [1990/44] | Representative(s) | Bouju, André BOUJU DERAMBURE (BUGNION) S.A. 38 avenue de la Grande Armée F-75017 Paris / FR | [1992/11] |
Former [1990/44] | Bouju, André Cabinet Bouju Derambure (Bugnion) S.A. B.P. 6250 F-75818 Paris Cédex 17 / FR | Application number, filing date | 89911253.6 | 27.09.1989 | [1990/44] | WO1989FR00493 | Priority number, date | FR19880012818 | 30.09.1988 Original published format: FR 8812818 | [1990/44] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9003469 | Date: | 05.04.1990 | Language: | FR | [1990/08] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0394401 | Date: | 31.10.1990 | Language: | FR | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 05.04.1990 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1990/44] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0394401 | Date: | 22.07.1992 | Language: | FR | [1992/30] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 05.04.1990 | Classification | IPC: | E01D19/06, E01C11/12 | [1990/44] | CPC: |
E01D19/06 (EP,US);
E01C11/126 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | BE, GB, IT, NL [1990/44] | Title | German: | VERBINDUNGSVORRICHTUNG ZWISCHEN ZWEI FAHRBAHNTEILEN, GETRENNT DURCH EINE DEHNUNGSFUGE | [1990/44] | English: | DEVICE FOR CONNECTING TWO ROAD SECTION SEPARATED BY AN EXPANSION JOINT | [1990/44] | French: | DISPOSITIF DE RACCORDEMENT ENTRE DEUX PARTIES DE CHAUSSEE SEPAREES PAR UN JOINT DE DILATATION | [1990/44] | Entry into regional phase | 23.05.1990 | National basic fee paid | 23.05.1990 | Designation fee(s) paid | 23.05.1990 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 23.05.1990 | Examination requested [1990/44] | 02.12.1991 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 28.01.1992 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 10.04.1992 | Fee for grant paid | 10.04.1992 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 23.04.1993 | No opposition filed within time limit [1993/28] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 16.09.1991 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [A]FR2228895 (CONVERSY FRANCOIS [FR]); | [A]US4131382 (HYMO LAWRENCE A); | [A]DE2330640 (WATSON BOWMAN ASSOCIATES); | [A]EP0015667 (GEN TIRE & RUBBER CO [US]) |