EP0454675 - ELECTROMAGNETIC FUEL INJECTOR WITH TILT ARMATURE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 11.06.1994 Database last updated on 05.08.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 11.06.1994 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 03.08.1994 [1994/31] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states SIEMENS AKTIENGESELLSCHAFT Werner-von-Siemens-Str. 1 DE-80333 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1991/45] | For all designated states SIEMENS AKTIENGESELLSCHAFT Wittelsbacherplatz 2 D-80333 München / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
MESENICH, Gerhard, Dipl.-Ing. Crengel-Danz-Strasse 63 A W-5810 Witten / DE | [1991/45] | Application number, filing date | 89911461.5 | 10.10.1989 | [1991/45] | WO1989US04323 | Priority number, date | DE19883834445 | 10.10.1988 Original published format: DE 3834445 | [1991/45] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9004097 | Date: | 19.04.1990 | Language: | EN | [1990/09] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0454675 | Date: | 06.11.1991 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 19.04.1990 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1991/45] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0454675 | Date: | 11.08.1993 | Language: | EN | [1993/32] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 19.04.1990 | Classification | IPC: | F02M51/08 | [1991/45] | CPC: |
F02M51/0639 (EP,US);
F02M51/0614 (EP,US);
F02M51/0692 (EP,US);
F02M51/08 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, IT [1991/45] | Title | German: | ELEKTROMAGNETISCHES DÜSENKLAPPENVENTIL FÜR KRAFTSTOFFEINSPRITZUNG IN KRAFTFAHRZEUGEN | [1991/45] | English: | ELECTROMAGNETIC FUEL INJECTOR WITH TILT ARMATURE | [1991/45] | French: | INJECTEUR ELECTROMAGNETIQUE DE CARBURANT A INDUIT A INCLINAISON | [1991/45] | Entry into regional phase | 02.04.1991 | National basic fee paid | 02.04.1991 | Designation fee(s) paid | 06.08.1991 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 08.05.1990 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: DE | 06.08.1991 | Examination requested [1991/45] | 28.09.1992 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 23.12.1992 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 05.02.1993 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 18.02.1993 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 07.05.1993 | Fee for grant paid | 07.05.1993 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 12.05.1994 | No opposition filed within time limit [1994/31] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 20.12.1990 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 23.10.1992 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [X]US4610425 (KELLY SAMUEL T [US]); | [X]EP0235451 (FUJIKURA RUBBER LTD [JP]); | [X]GB2094942 (HOLZER WALTER); | [X]DE2440565 ; | [X]DE3619818 (MAIER WERNER [DE], et al); | [A]DE2161617 | [A] - Patent Abstracts of Japan, Vol 10, No 146, M482, abstract of JP 61- 2982, publ 1986-01-08 | Examination | EP0172591 |