EP0441808 - METHOD AND APPARATUS FOR DECODING A QUADRATURE MODULATED SIGNAL [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 19.04.1996 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 19.04.1996 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 05.06.1996 [1996/23] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states MOTOROLA, INC. 1303 East Algonquin Road Schaumburg, IL 60196 / US | [1991/34] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
LEITCH, Clifford, Dana 673 N.W. 111th Way Coral Springs, FL 33071 / US | [1991/34] | Representative(s) | Lupton, Frederick, et al Motorola European Intellectual Property Midpoint Alencon Link Basingstoke Hampshire RG21 1PL / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1991/34] | Lupton, Frederick, et al Motorola European Intellectual Property, Midpoint, Alencon Link Basingstoke, Hampshire RG21 1PL / GB | Application number, filing date | 89911691.7 | 02.10.1989 | [1991/34] | WO1989US04246 | Priority number, date | US19880266043 | 02.11.1988 Original published format: US 266043 | [1991/34] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9005415 | Date: | 17.05.1990 | Language: | EN | [1990/11] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0441808 | Date: | 21.08.1991 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 17.05.1990 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1991/34] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 17.05.1990 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 07.10.1993 | Classification | IPC: | H04B1/26, H04L27/06 | [1991/34] | CPC: |
H04L27/38 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, DE, FR, GB, IT, LU, NL, SE [1991/34] | Title | German: | VERFAHREN UND VORRICHTUNG ZUM DEKODIEREN EINES QUADRATOR-MODULIERTEN SIGNALS | [1991/34] | English: | METHOD AND APPARATUS FOR DECODING A QUADRATURE MODULATED SIGNAL | [1991/34] | French: | PROCEDE ET APPAREIL DE DECODAGE D'UN SIGNAL MODULE EN QUADRATURE | [1991/34] | File destroyed: | 20.04.2002 | Entry into regional phase | 02.05.1991 | National basic fee paid | 02.05.1991 | Search fee paid | 02.05.1991 | Designation fee(s) paid | 02.05.1991 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 16.03.1990 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: DE | 02.05.1991 | Examination requested [1991/34] | 29.11.1994 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 10.04.1995 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 27.07.1995 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 07.12.1995 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [1996/23] | 05.01.1996 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [1996/23] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 28.10.1991 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 29.10.1992 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 28.10.1993 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 27.10.1994 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 31.10.1995 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]EP0008521 (UNIV ILLINOIS [US]) | International search | [Y]US4085378 (RYAN CARL R, et al); | [Y]US4476585 (REED JOSEPH [US]); | [Y]US4559499 (BURSZTEJN JACQUES [FR], et al); | [Y]US4608540 (TSUCHIYA MASAHIRO [JP], et al); | [X]US4737969 (STEEL FRANCIS R [US], et al) |