EP0439505 - KNEE PROSTHESIS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 09.03.1995 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 09.03.1995 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 26.04.1995 [1995/17] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states UNIVERSITY COLLEGE LONDON 5 Gower Street London WC1E 6BT / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1991/32] | For all designated states UNIVERSITY COLLEGE LONDON Gower Street London WC1E 6BT / GB | Inventor(s) | 01 /
MAY, Denis Ronald William Biomed.Eng. Dept Inst. of Orthop. Royal Nat. Orthop. Hosp. Stanmore Middlesex HA7 4LP / GB | [1994/18] |
Former [1991/32] | 01 /
MAY, Denis Ronald William Biomed.Eng. Dept Inst. of Orthop. Royal Nat. Orthop. Hosp. Stanmore Middl.HA7 4LP / GB | Representative(s) | Beresford, Keith Denis Lewis, et al Beresford Crump LLP 16 High Holborn London WC1V 6BX / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1991/32] | Beresford, Keith Denis Lewis, et al BERESFORD & Co. 2-5 Warwick Court High Holborn London WC1R 5DJ / GB | Application number, filing date | 89911850.9 | 18.10.1989 | [1991/32] | WO1989GB01235 | Priority number, date | GB19880024383 | 18.10.1988 Original published format: GB 8824383 | [1991/32] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9004369 | Date: | 03.05.1990 | Language: | EN | [1990/10] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0439505 | Date: | 07.08.1991 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 03.05.1990 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1991/32] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0439505 | Date: | 04.05.1994 | Language: | EN | [1994/18] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 03.05.1990 | Classification | IPC: | A61F2/38 | [1991/32] | CPC: |
A61F2/3868 (EP,US);
A61F2/3886 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, FR, GB, IT, LI, LU, NL, SE [1991/32] | Title | German: | KNIEPROTHESE | [1991/32] | English: | KNEE PROSTHESIS | [1991/32] | French: | PROTHESE DU GENOU | [1991/32] | Entry into regional phase | 15.04.1991 | National basic fee paid | 15.04.1991 | Designation fee(s) paid | 15.04.1991 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 18.05.1990 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: GB | 15.04.1991 | Examination requested [1991/32] | 09.09.1992 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 19.03.1993 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 28.06.1993 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 12.07.1993 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 08.09.1993 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 02.11.1993 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 18.11.1993 | Fee for grant paid | 18.11.1993 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 07.02.1995 | No opposition filed within time limit [1995/17] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 23.09.1991 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 26.10.1992 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 22.10.1993 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | FR2445137 [ ] (DEAUX ETS); | US4216549 [ ] (HILLBERRY BENNY M [US], et al); | US4209861 [ ] (BORZONE ROCCO [US], et al); | FR2568467 [ ] (BENOIST GIRARD CIE [FR]) |