EP0446216 - Toroidal race rolling traction transmission unit [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [1991/38] | TOROIDAL RACE ROLLING TRACTION TRANSMISSION UNITS | ||
[1994/50] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 19.10.1995 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 19.10.1995 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 06.12.1995 [1995/49] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Perry, Forbes George De Brie Long Meadow Church Street Charlbury Oxford OX7 3PP / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1991/38] | For all designated states Perry, Forbes George De Brie Long Meadow Church Street Charlbury Oxford OX7 3PP / GB | Inventor(s) | 01 /
see applicant ... | [1991/38] | Representative(s) | Horton, Andrew Robert Grant, et al Bowles Horton Felden House Dower Mews High Street Berkhamsted, Hertfordshire HP4 2BL / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1991/38] | Horton, Andrew Robert Grant, et al BOWLES HORTON Felden House Dower Mews High Street Berkhamsted Hertfordshire HP4 2BL / GB | Application number, filing date | 89911999.4 | 26.09.1989 | [1991/38] | WO1989GB01134 | Priority number, date | GB19880025198 | 27.10.1988 Original published format: GB 8825198 | [1991/38] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9004729 | Date: | 03.05.1990 | Language: | EN | [1990/10] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0446216 | Date: | 18.09.1991 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 03.05.1990 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1991/38] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0446216 | Date: | 14.12.1994 | Language: | EN | [1994/50] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 03.05.1990 | Classification | IPC: | F16H15/38 | [1991/38] | CPC: |
F16H15/38 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, IT, NL, SE [1991/38] | Title | German: | Toroidal-Reibradgetriebe | [1994/50] | English: | Toroidal race rolling traction transmission unit | [1994/50] | French: | Transmission toroidale à rouleaux de friction | [1994/50] |
Former [1991/38] | TOROID-REIBRADGETRIEBE | ||
Former [1991/38] | TOROIDAL RACE ROLLING TRACTION TRANSMISSION UNITS | ||
Former [1991/38] | Transmission toroidale à rouleaux defriction | Entry into regional phase | 26.03.1991 | National basic fee paid | 26.03.1991 | Designation fee(s) paid | 26.03.1991 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 16.05.1990 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: DE | 26.03.1991 | Examination requested [1991/38] | 13.05.1993 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 15.09.1993 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 10.02.1994 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 17.06.1994 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 07.09.1994 | Fee for grant paid | 07.09.1994 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 15.09.1995 | No opposition filed within time limit [1995/49] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 31.08.1991 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 10.09.1992 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 09.09.1993 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 08.09.1994 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [A]FR1531007 (ENGLISH ELECTRIC CO LTD); | [A]GB979062 (NAT RES DEV); | [A]GB1069874 (NAT RES DEV); | [A]GB2107009 (NAT RES DEV [GB]) |