EP0438508 - VARIABLE PARAMETER OPTICAL BOTTLE CHECKER [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 12.07.1996 Database last updated on 24.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 30.11.2007 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state Updated state(s): FR, NL State(s) deleted from list of lapses: CH, LI | published on 02.01.2008 [2008/01] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states BRANDT MANUFACTURING SYSTEMS, INC. P.O. Box 66 Deposit, NY 13754 / US | [1991/31] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
BRANDT, Thomas, L. RD 3, Box 3470 Windsor, NY 13865 / US | [1991/31] | Representative(s) | Jenkins, Peter David, et al Page White & Farrer Limited Bedford House 21A John Street London WC1N 2BF / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1991/31] | Jenkins, Peter David, et al PAGE WHITE & FARRER 54 Doughty Street London WC1N 2LS / GB | Application number, filing date | 89912053.9 | 10.10.1989 | [1991/31] | WO1989US04321 | Priority number, date | US19880254640 | 07.10.1988 Original published format: US 254640 | [1991/31] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9004162 | Date: | 19.04.1990 | Language: | EN | [1990/09] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0438508 | Date: | 31.07.1991 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 19.04.1990 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1991/31] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0438508 | Date: | 06.09.1995 | Language: | EN | [1995/36] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 19.04.1990 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 16.09.1991 | Classification | IPC: | G01N21/90 | [1995/36] | CPC: |
G01N21/90 (EP,US);
G01N9/04 (KR);
G01N21/93 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [1991/31] | G01N9/04, G06M7/00 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, FR, GB, IT, LI, LU, NL, SE [1991/31] | Title | German: | OPTISCHE KONTROLLVORRICHTUNG FÜR FLASCHEN MIT VARIABLEN PARAMETERN | [1995/36] | English: | VARIABLE PARAMETER OPTICAL BOTTLE CHECKER | [1991/31] | French: | CONTROLEUR OPTIQUE DE BOUTEILLES A PARAMETRES VARIABLES | [1991/31] |
Former [1991/31] | OPTISCHER REGLER FÜR FLASCHEN MIT VARIABLEN PARAMETERN | File destroyed: | 20.04.2002 | Entry into regional phase | 05.04.1991 | National basic fee paid | 05.04.1991 | Search fee paid | 05.04.1991 | Designation fee(s) paid | 05.04.1991 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 07.05.1990 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: DE | 05.04.1991 | Examination requested [1991/31] | 26.08.1993 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 11.04.1994 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time | 16.06.1994 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 17.10.1994 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 13.03.1995 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 16.06.1995 | Fee for grant paid | 16.06.1995 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 08.06.1996 | No opposition filed within time limit [1996/35] | Request for further processing for: | 16.06.1994 | Request for further processing filed | 16.06.1994 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 01.07.1994 | Decision despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 24.10.1991 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 23.10.1992 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 19.10.1993 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 24.10.1994 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 06.09.1995 | BE | 06.09.1995 | FR | 06.09.1995 | IT | 06.09.1995 | NL | 06.09.1995 | LU | 31.10.1995 | GB | 06.12.1995 | SE | 06.12.1995 | DE | 07.12.1995 | [2008/01] |
Former [2000/52] | AT | 06.09.1995 | |
BE | 06.09.1995 | ||
CH | 06.09.1995 | ||
IT | 06.09.1995 | ||
LI | 06.09.1995 | ||
LU | 31.10.1995 | ||
NL | 31.10.1995 | ||
GB | 06.12.1995 | ||
SE | 06.12.1995 | ||
DE | 07.12.1995 | ||
FR | 02.02.1996 | ||
Former [2000/50] | AT | 06.09.1995 | |
BE | 06.09.1995 | ||
IT | 06.09.1995 | ||
LU | 31.10.1995 | ||
NL | 31.10.1995 | ||
GB | 06.12.1995 | ||
SE | 06.12.1995 | ||
DE | 07.12.1995 | ||
CH | 13.12.1995 | ||
LI | 13.12.1995 | ||
FR | 02.02.1996 | ||
Former [2000/27] | AT | 06.09.1995 | |
BE | 06.09.1995 | ||
IT | 06.09.1995 | ||
LU | 31.10.1995 | ||
NL | 31.10.1995 | ||
GB | 06.12.1995 | ||
SE | 06.12.1995 | ||
DE | 07.12.1995 | ||
FR | 02.02.1996 | ||
Former [2000/06] | AT | 06.09.1995 | |
BE | 06.09.1995 | ||
IT | 06.09.1995 | ||
LU | 31.10.1995 | ||
GB | 06.12.1995 | ||
SE | 06.12.1995 | ||
DE | 07.12.1995 | ||
FR | 02.02.1996 | ||
Former [1999/42] | AT | 06.09.1995 | |
BE | 06.09.1995 | ||
IT | 06.09.1995 | ||
GB | 06.12.1995 | ||
SE | 06.12.1995 | ||
DE | 07.12.1995 | ||
FR | 02.02.1996 | ||
Former [1997/14] | AT | 06.09.1995 | |
BE | 06.09.1995 | ||
GB | 06.12.1995 | ||
SE | 06.12.1995 | ||
DE | 07.12.1995 | ||
FR | 02.02.1996 | ||
Former [1996/30] | AT | 06.09.1995 | |
BE | 06.09.1995 | ||
SE | 06.12.1995 | ||
DE | 07.12.1995 | ||
FR | 02.02.1996 | ||
Former [1996/28] | AT | 06.09.1995 | |
BE | 06.09.1995 | ||
SE | 06.12.1995 | ||
DE | 07.12.1995 | ||
Former [1996/23] | BE | 06.09.1995 | |
SE | 06.12.1995 | ||
DE | 07.12.1995 | ||
Former [1996/22] | BE | 06.09.1995 | |
DE | 07.12.1995 | ||
Former [1996/14] | DE | 07.12.1995 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US3818223 (GIBSON G, et al); | [A]US4140901 (FISCHER KNUT, et al) | International search | [A]US3557950 (POWERS WHITNEY); | [A]US3690456 (POWERS WHITNEY S JR); | [A]US3880750 (BUTLER RICHARD L, et al); | [A]US4213702 (BRYANT NELSON [US], et al); | [A]US4454542 (MIYAZAWA TAKASHI [JP]); | [A]US4467350 (MILLER JOHN W V [US]); | [A]US4488648 (CLAYPOOL MARK P [US]); | [A]US4509075 (SIMMS R JOHN [US], et al); | [A]US4584469 (LOVALENTI SAM [US]); | [A]US4601395 (JUVINALL JOHN W [US], et al); | [A]US4764681 (MICHALSKI THOMAS F [US], et al) |