EP0439522 - A PLASTIC STORAGE TANK [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 25.03.1993 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 12.11.1999 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): LU | published on 29.12.1999 [1999/52] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states KSB Aktiengesellschaft Johann-Klein-Strasse 9 67227 Frankenthal / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1991/32] | For all designated states KSB Aktiengesellschaft Johann-Klein-Strasse 9 D-67227 Frankenthal / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
KLEINDIENST, Siegfried Schlossstrasse 20 D-6711 Laumersheim / DE | 02 /
KOCHANOWSKI, Wolfgang Im Elzerich 2 D-6531 Windesheim / DE | [1991/32] | Application number, filing date | 89912101.6 | 06.10.1989 | [1991/32] | WO1989EP01171 | Priority number, date | DE19883836058 | 22.10.1988 Original published format: DE 3836058 | [1991/32] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9004686 | Date: | 03.05.1990 | Language: | DE | [1990/10] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0439522 | Date: | 07.08.1991 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 03.05.1990 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1991/32] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0439522 | Date: | 20.05.1992 | Language: | DE | [1992/21] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 03.05.1990 | Classification | IPC: | E03F5/22, E03F5/10 | [1992/21] | CPC: |
E03F5/22 (EP);
B65D79/008 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [1991/32] | E03F5/22 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, FR, GB, IT, LI, LU, NL, SE [1991/32] | Title | German: | KUNSTSTOFFBEHÄLTER | [1991/32] | English: | A PLASTIC STORAGE TANK | [1991/32] | French: | RESERVOIR DE STOCKAGE EN MATIERE PLASTIQUE | [1991/32] | Entry into regional phase | 27.12.1990 | National basic fee paid | 27.12.1990 | Designation fee(s) paid | 27.12.1990 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 10.05.1990 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: DE | 27.12.1990 | Examination requested [1991/32] | 26.09.1991 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 22.11.1991 | Fee for grant paid | 22.11.1991 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 26.11.1991 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | Opposition(s) | 23.02.1993 | No opposition filed within time limit [1993/19] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 19.10.1991 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | BE | 20.05.1992 | SE | 20.05.1992 | CH | 31.10.1992 | LI | 31.10.1992 | LU | 31.10.1992 | [1999/52] |
Former [1993/38] | BE | 20.05.1992 | |
SE | 20.05.1992 | ||
CH | 31.10.1992 | ||
LI | 31.10.1992 | ||
Former [1993/13] | BE | 20.05.1992 | |
SE | 20.05.1992 | ||
Former [1992/52] | SE | 20.05.1992 | Cited in | International search | DE3322259 [ ] (BLUM ALBERT); | FR1511724 [ ]; | EP0319362 [ ] (CAOUTCHOUC MANUF PLASTIQUE [FR]); | DE2551058 [ ] (ZEHNDER JUERGEN) |