EP0444072 - A METHOD AND APPARATUS FOR FORMING AN ABSORPTION BODY [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Request for examination was made Status updated on 18.07.1991 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 19.12.1991 | Change - miscellaneous | published on 12.02.1992 [1992/07] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Mölnlycke AB Fabriksvägen 1 435 01 Mölnlycke / SE | [N/P] |
Former [1991/36] | For all designated states MÖLNLYCKE AB Fabriksvägen 1 S-435 01 Mölnlycke / SE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
HANSEN, Kjell vre Vargvei 32 N-3152 Jers y / NO | [1991/36] | Representative(s) | Kierkegaard, Lars-Olov, et al Albihns Stockholm AB, Box 5581 114 85 Stockholm / SE | [N/P] |
Former [1991/36] | Kierkegaard, Lars-Olov, et al H. Albihns Patentbyra AB, P.O. Box 3137 S-103 62 Stockholm / SE | Application number, filing date | 89912519.9 | 14.11.1989 | [1991/36] | WO1989SE00657 | Priority number, date | SE19880004119 | 15.11.1988 Original published format: SE 8804119 | [1991/36] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9005511 | Date: | 31.05.1990 | Language: | EN | [1990/12] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0444072 | Date: | 04.09.1991 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 31.05.1990 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1991/36] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | SE | 31.05.1990 | Classification | IPC: | A61F13/15, D04H1/72 | [1991/36] | CPC: |
A61F13/15626 (EP,US);
A61F2013/15926 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | BE, DE, FR, GB, IT, NL, SE [1991/36] | Title | German: | VERFAHREN UND VORRICHTUNG ZUR BILDUNG EINES ABSORPTIONSKÖRPERS | [1991/36] | English: | A METHOD AND APPARATUS FOR FORMING AN ABSORPTION BODY | [1991/36] | French: | PROCEDE ET DISPOSITIF POUR FORMER UN CORPS ABSORBANT | [1991/36] | Miscellaneous | EPB 1992/07: Verfahren abgeschlossen infolge Verbindung mit 89850397.4/0369974 (europäische Anmeldenummer/Veröffentlichungsnummer) vom 30.12.91 | EPB 1992/07: Proceedings concluded following consolidation with 89850397.4/0369974 (European application No./publication No.) by decision dated 30.12.91 | EPB 1992/07: Procédure close par suite de la jonction avec la demande no. 89850397.4/0369974 (numéro de dépôt/numéro de publication de la demande européenne) par décision du 30.12.91 | Entry into regional phase | 17.04.1991 | National basic fee paid | 17.04.1991 | Designation fee(s) paid | 17.04.1991 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 08.05.1990 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: DE | 17.04.1991 | Examination requested [1991/36] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 19.10.1991 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | by applicant | SE455467 |