EP0444091 - CARBON COPY SET CONSISTING OF UNINSCRIBED AND/OR INSCRIBED SHEETS AND/OR FORMS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 09.04.1994 Database last updated on 17.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 30.11.2007 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state Updated state(s): FR | published on 02.01.2008 [2008/01] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Müller, Thomas Bendstrasse 17 D-52066 Aachen / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1991/36] | For all designated states MÜLLER, Thomas Bendstrasse 17 D-52066 Aachen / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
see applicant ... | [1991/36] | Representative(s) | König, Werner Patentanwälte König & Kollegen Kackertstrasse 10 52072 Aachen / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1991/36] | König, Werner, Dipl.-Ing. Habsburgerallee 23-25 D-52064 Aachen / DE | Application number, filing date | 89912874.8 | 18.11.1989 | [1991/36] | WO1989DE00723 | Priority number, date | DE19883839240 | 21.11.1988 Original published format: DE 3839240 | DE19893908925 | 18.03.1989 Original published format: DE 3908925 | [1991/36] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9005639 | Date: | 31.05.1990 | Language: | DE | [1990/12] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0444091 | Date: | 04.09.1991 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 31.05.1990 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1991/36] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0444091 | Date: | 09.06.1993 | Language: | DE | [1993/23] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 31.05.1990 | Classification | IPC: | B41L1/22, B41L1/24 | [1991/36] | CPC: |
B41L1/22 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, ES, FR, GB, IT, LI, LU, NL, SE [1991/36] | Title | German: | DURCHSCHREIBESATZ, BESTEHEND AUS UNBESCHRIFTETEN UND/ODER BESCHRIFTETEN BLÄTTERN UND/ODER FORMULARBLÄTTERN | [1991/36] | English: | CARBON COPY SET CONSISTING OF UNINSCRIBED AND/OR INSCRIBED SHEETS AND/OR FORMS | [1991/36] | French: | ENSEMBLE AUTOCOPIANT COMPOSE DE FEUILLES ET/OU DE FORMULAIRES NON ECRITS ET/OU ECRITS | [1991/36] | Entry into regional phase | 17.05.1991 | National basic fee paid | 17.05.1991 | Designation fee(s) paid | 17.05.1991 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 21.05.1990 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: DE | 17.05.1991 | Examination requested [1991/36] | 16.06.1992 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 16.10.1992 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 26.11.1992 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 11.12.1992 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 03.03.1993 | Fee for grant paid | 03.03.1993 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 10.03.1994 | No opposition filed within time limit [1994/22] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 19.11.1991 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 23.11.1992 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | BE | 09.06.1993 | ES | 09.06.1993 | FR | 09.06.1993 | GB | 09.06.1993 | IT | 09.06.1993 | NL | 09.06.1993 | SE | 09.06.1993 | AT | 18.11.1993 | CH | 30.11.1993 | LI | 30.11.1993 | LU | 30.11.1993 | [2004/35] |
Former [2002/24] | BE | 09.06.1993 | |
ES | 09.06.1993 | ||
GB | 09.06.1993 | ||
IT | 09.06.1993 | ||
NL | 09.06.1993 | ||
SE | 09.06.1993 | ||
FR | 29.10.1993 | ||
AT | 18.11.1993 | ||
CH | 30.11.1993 | ||
LI | 30.11.1993 | ||
LU | 30.11.1993 | ||
Former [2000/06] | BE | 09.06.1993 | |
GB | 09.06.1993 | ||
IT | 09.06.1993 | ||
NL | 09.06.1993 | ||
SE | 09.06.1993 | ||
FR | 29.10.1993 | ||
AT | 18.11.1993 | ||
CH | 30.11.1993 | ||
LI | 30.11.1993 | ||
LU | 30.11.1993 | ||
Former [1999/42] | BE | 09.06.1993 | |
GB | 09.06.1993 | ||
IT | 09.06.1993 | ||
NL | 09.06.1993 | ||
SE | 09.06.1993 | ||
FR | 29.10.1993 | ||
AT | 18.11.1993 | ||
CH | 30.11.1993 | ||
LI | 30.11.1993 | ||
Former [1995/15] | BE | 09.06.1993 | |
GB | 09.06.1993 | ||
NL | 09.06.1993 | ||
SE | 09.06.1993 | ||
FR | 29.10.1993 | ||
AT | 18.11.1993 | ||
CH | 30.11.1993 | ||
LI | 30.11.1993 | ||
Former [1994/48] | BE | 09.06.1993 | |
GB | 09.06.1993 | ||
NL | 09.06.1993 | ||
SE | 09.06.1993 | ||
FR | 29.10.1993 | ||
CH | 30.11.1993 | ||
LI | 30.11.1993 | ||
Former [1994/25] | BE | 09.06.1993 | |
GB | 09.06.1993 | ||
NL | 09.06.1993 | ||
SE | 09.06.1993 | ||
FR | 29.10.1993 | ||
Former [1994/24] | GB | 09.06.1993 | |
NL | 09.06.1993 | ||
SE | 09.06.1993 | ||
FR | 29.10.1993 | ||
Former [1994/22] | GB | 09.06.1993 | |
NL | 09.06.1993 | ||
SE | 09.06.1993 | ||
Former [1994/09] | NL | 09.06.1993 | |
SE | 09.06.1993 | ||
Former [1994/01] | NL | 09.06.1993 | Cited in | International search | [X]US2771026 (MOONEY LAURENCE R); | [X]DE3204964 (DEMOLUX [DE]); | [A]US2253917 (ROGERS HOWARD W); | [A]DE1611538 (MEYER JOHANNES) |