EP0445170 - PROCESS FOR RECOVERING A CODED SIGNAL SEQUENCE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 07.10.1992 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 07.10.1992 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 25.11.1992 [1992/48] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states ARNOLD & RICHTER CINE TECHNIK GMBH & CO. BETRIEBS KG Türkenstrasse 89 80799 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1991/37] | For all designated states ARNOLD & RICHTER CINE TECHNIK GMBH & CO. BETRIEBS KG. Türkenstrasse 89 D-80799 München / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
KÖHLER, Hanns Danklstrasse 29 D-8000 München 70 / DE | 02 /
JACUMET, Klaus Barlacherstrasse 1C D-8000 München 40 / DE | [1991/37] | Representative(s) | Ninnemann, Detlef Patentanwälte Maikowski & Ninnemann Postfach 15 09 20 10671 Berlin / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1991/37] | Ninnemann, Detlef, Dipl.-Ing. Patentanwälte Maikowski & Ninnemann, Xantener Strasse 10 D-10707 Berlin / DE | Application number, filing date | 89913038.9 | 24.11.1989 | [1991/37] | WO1989DE00743 | Priority number, date | DE19883839749 | 25.11.1988 Original published format: DE 3839749 | [1991/37] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9006578 | Date: | 14.06.1990 | Language: | DE | [1990/14] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0445170 | Date: | 11.09.1991 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 14.06.1990 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1991/37] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 14.06.1990 | Classification | IPC: | G11B20/10, H03K5/08 | [1991/37] | CPC: |
G11B20/10203 (EP);
G11B27/24 (EP);
G11B27/323 (EP);
H03K5/084 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, CH, DE, FR, GB, IT, LI [1991/37] | Title | German: | VERFAHREN ZUM WIEDERGEWINNEN EINER KODIERTEN SIGNALFOLGE | [1991/37] | English: | PROCESS FOR RECOVERING A CODED SIGNAL SEQUENCE | [1991/37] | French: | PROCEDE POUR LA RECUPERATION D'UNE SERIE CODEE DE SIGNAUX | [1991/37] | File destroyed: | 12.06.1999 | Entry into regional phase | 12.02.1991 | National basic fee paid | 12.02.1991 | Designation fee(s) paid | 11.03.1991 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 21.06.1990 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: DE | 11.03.1991 | Examination requested [1991/37] | 30.01.1992 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 19.02.1992 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 30.05.1992 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [1992/48] | 01.07.1992 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: fee for grant / fee for printing not paid in time [1992/48] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 14.10.1991 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [A]GB2062421 ; | [A]GB2172467 ; | [A]EP0061682 ; | [A]JPS58189810 ; | [A]JPS56115024 | [X] - IBM TECHNICAL DISCLOSURE BULLETIN. vol. 9, no. 2, Juli 1966NEW YORK US Seiten 160 - 160; R.A.AZIZ: "DATA DETECTION WITH AUTOMATIC CLIPPING ADJUST" siehe das ganze Dokument | [X] - IBM TECHNICAL DISCLOSURE BULLETIN. vol. 18, no. 6, November 1975NEW YORK US Seiten 1962 - 1965; R.E.PENNY: "DYNAMIC THRESHOLD SETTING CIRCUIT" siehe das ganze Dokument | [X] - IBM TECHNICAL DISCLOSURE BULLETIN. vol. 20, no. 8, Januar 1978NEW YORK US Seiten 3199 - 3200; W.R.YOUNT: "THRESHOLDING CIRCUIT" siehe das ganze Dokument | [A] - ELECTRONICS. vol. 43, no. 12, 08 Juni 1970NEW YORK US Seite 97 J.SCHLAGETER: "TELEMETRY SIGNAL CONDITIONER CENTERS ITS SLICING LEVEL" | [A] - JOURNAL OF THE SOCIETY OF MOTION PICTURE AND TELEVISION vol. 93, no. 8, August 1984SCARSDALE US Seiten 730 - 745; R.E.UHLIG: "TECHNICAL EXPERIENCE WITH DATAKODE MAGNETIC CONTROL SURFACE" | [A] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN vol. 8, no. 38 (P-255)(1475) 18 Februar 1984, & JP-A-58 189810 (AKAI DENKI K.K.) 05 November 1983siehe das ganze Dokument | [A] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN vol. 5, no. 192 (E-85)(864) 08 Dezember 1981, & JP-A-56 115024 (NIPPON DENKI K.K.) 10 September 1981siehe das ganze Dokument |