EP0445180 - SYSTEM AND METHOD FOR RAPID CHARGING OF A BATTERY [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 11.04.1997 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 30.11.2007 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state Updated state(s): FR | published on 02.01.2008 [2008/01] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states MATTSSON, Bertil Baatsmanskroken 26 S-126 57 Hägersten / SE | [1996/21] |
Former [1991/37] | For all designated states MATTSSON, Bertil Batsmanskroken 26 S-126 57 Hägersten / SE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
see applicant ... | [1991/37] | Representative(s) | Roth, Ernst Adolf Michael, et al Ström & Gulliksson IP AB Sjöporten 4 417 64 Göteborg / SE | [N/P] |
Former [1991/37] | Roth, Ernst Adolf Michael, et al GÖTEBORGS PATENTBYRA AB Box 5005 S-402 21 Göteborg / SE | Application number, filing date | 89913110.6 | 24.11.1989 | [1991/37] | WO1989SE00682 | Priority number, date | SE19880004267 | 25.11.1988 Original published format: SE 8804267 | [1991/37] | Filing language | SV | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9006615 | Date: | 14.06.1990 | Language: | EN | [1990/14] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0445180 | Date: | 11.09.1991 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 14.06.1990 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1991/37] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0445180 | Date: | 05.06.1996 | Language: | EN | [1996/23] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | SE | 14.06.1990 | Classification | IPC: | H02J7/04 | [1991/37] | CPC: |
H02J7/00711 (EP,US);
H02J7/007182 (EP,US);
Y02B40/00 (US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, ES, FR, GB, IT, LI, LU, NL, SE [1991/37] | Title | German: | VERFAHREN UND VORRICHTUNG ZUM SCHNELLADEN EINER BATTERIE | [1991/37] | English: | SYSTEM AND METHOD FOR RAPID CHARGING OF A BATTERY | [1991/37] | French: | SYSTEME ET METHODE POUR RECHARGE RAPIDE D'UNE BATTERIE | [1991/37] | Entry into regional phase | 22.06.1990 | Translation filed | 15.05.1991 | National basic fee paid | 15.05.1991 | Designation fee(s) paid | 15.05.1991 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 21.06.1990 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: DE | 15.05.1991 | Examination requested [1991/37] | 08.02.1995 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 19.06.1995 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 08.08.1995 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 29.08.1995 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 21.11.1995 | Fee for grant paid | 21.11.1995 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 06.03.1997 | No opposition filed within time limit [1997/22] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 29.11.1991 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 28.05.1993 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 29.11.1993 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 16.11.1994 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 30.11.1995 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.11.1992 | 04   M06   Fee paid on   28.05.1993 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 05.06.1996 | BE | 05.06.1996 | CH | 05.06.1996 | ES | 05.06.1996 | FR | 05.06.1996 | IT | 05.06.1996 | LI | 05.06.1996 | NL | 05.06.1996 | SE | 05.09.1996 | DE | 06.09.1996 | LU | 30.11.1996 | [2006/14] |
Former [2003/07] | AT | 05.06.1996 | |
BE | 05.06.1996 | ||
CH | 05.06.1996 | ||
ES | 05.06.1996 | ||
IT | 05.06.1996 | ||
LI | 05.06.1996 | ||
NL | 05.06.1996 | ||
SE | 05.09.1996 | ||
DE | 06.09.1996 | ||
FR | 31.10.1996 | ||
LU | 30.11.1996 | ||
Former [2002/24] | AT | 05.06.1996 | |
BE | 05.06.1996 | ||
CH | 05.06.1996 | ||
ES | 05.06.1996 | ||
IT | 05.06.1996 | ||
LI | 05.06.1996 | ||
SE | 05.09.1996 | ||
DE | 06.09.1996 | ||
FR | 31.10.1996 | ||
LU | 30.11.1996 | ||
Former [2000/06] | AT | 05.06.1996 | |
BE | 05.06.1996 | ||
CH | 05.06.1996 | ||
IT | 05.06.1996 | ||
LI | 05.06.1996 | ||
SE | 05.09.1996 | ||
DE | 06.09.1996 | ||
FR | 31.10.1996 | ||
LU | 30.11.1996 | ||
Former [1999/42] | AT | 05.06.1996 | |
BE | 05.06.1996 | ||
CH | 05.06.1996 | ||
IT | 05.06.1996 | ||
LI | 05.06.1996 | ||
SE | 05.09.1996 | ||
DE | 06.09.1996 | ||
FR | 31.10.1996 | ||
Former [1997/28] | AT | 05.06.1996 | |
BE | 05.06.1996 | ||
CH | 05.06.1996 | ||
LI | 05.06.1996 | ||
SE | 05.09.1996 | ||
DE | 06.09.1996 | ||
FR | 31.10.1996 | ||
Former [1997/21] | AT | 05.06.1996 | |
BE | 05.06.1996 | ||
SE | 05.09.1996 | ||
DE | 06.09.1996 | ||
FR | 31.10.1996 | ||
Former [1997/17] | AT | 05.06.1996 | |
SE | 05.09.1996 | ||
DE | 06.09.1996 | ||
FR | 31.10.1996 | ||
Former [1997/03] | AT | 05.06.1996 | |
DE | 06.09.1996 | Cited in | International search | [A]US3586955 (KISIEL EDMUND); | [A]US3886428 (MACHARG JAMES ADRIAN); | [A]US3987353 (MACHARG JAMES ADRIAN); | [A]US4246529 (JURGENS GUNTER R, et al) | Examination | US4179648 |