EP0377453 - Guiding wire [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 18.12.1992 Database last updated on 23.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 18.12.1992 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 10.02.1993 [1993/06] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Baker, Susan 41 Rusham Park Avenue Egham, Surrey / GB | [1990/28] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
see applicant ... | [1990/28] | Representative(s) | Dr. Solf & Zapf Patent- und Rechtsanwalts PartG mbB Candidplatz 15 81543 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1990/28] | Patentanwälte Dr. Solf & Zapf Candidplatz 15 D-81543 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 90100094.3 | 03.01.1990 | [1990/28] | Priority number, date | DE19890000077U | 04.01.1989 Original published format: DE 8900077 U | [1990/28] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0377453 | Date: | 11.07.1990 | Language: | DE | [1990/28] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 07.05.1990 | Classification | IPC: | A61M25/01 | [1990/28] | CPC: |
A61M25/09033 (EP);
A61M2025/09083 (EP);
A61M2025/09091 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, DE, DK, ES, FR, GB, IT, NL, SE [1990/28] | Title | German: | Führungsdraht | [1990/28] | English: | Guiding wire | [1990/28] | French: | Fil de guidage | [1990/28] | File destroyed: | 20.04.2002 | Examination procedure | 11.01.1991 | Examination requested [1991/11] | 01.08.1992 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [1993/06] | 11.09.1992 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [1993/06] | Fees paid | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.01.1992 | 03   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | WO8804940 [ ]; | US4721117 [ ]; | DE8328562U [ ]; | DE3516052 [ ] |