EP0379890 - New tissue plasminogen activator [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 05.09.1994 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 05.09.1994 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 26.10.1994 [1994/43] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states FUJISAWA PHARMACEUTICAL CO., LTD. 3, Doshomachi 4-chome Higashi-ku Osaka-shi Osaka 541 / JP | [N/P] |
Former [1990/31] | For all designated states FUJISAWA PHARMACEUTICAL CO., LTD. 3, Doshomachi 4-chome Higashi-ku Osaka-shi Osaka 541 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Niwa, Mineo 7-15, Kirinokuchi Kamiueno-cho Muko-shi Kyoto 617 / JP | 02 /
Satoh, Susumu 7-9-4, Higashitokiwadai Toyono-cho Toyono-gun Osaka 563-01 / JP | 03 /
Suzuki, Shingo 8-19, Misaki 7-chome Suminoe-ku Osaka-shi Osaka 559 / JP | 04 /
Otsuka, Kazuyuki 5-36-211, Nankounaka 5-chome Suminoe-ku Osaka-shi Osaka 559 / JP | 05 /
Kusunoki, Chihiro 6-B-407, Satsukigaokahigashi Suita-shi Osaka 565 / JP | [1990/31] | Representative(s) | Bühling, Gerhard, et al Patentanwaltsbüro Tiedtke-Bühling-Kinne & Partner Bavariaring 4 80336 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1994/08] | Bühling, Gerhard, Dipl.-Chem., et al Patentanwaltsbüro Tiedtke-Bühling-Kinne & Partner Bavariaring 4 D-80336 München / DE | ||
Former [1990/31] | Bühling, Gerhard, Dipl.-Chem. Patentanwaltsbüro Tiedtke-Bühling-Kinne & Partner Bavariaring 4 D-80336 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 90100457.2 | 10.01.1990 | [1990/31] | Priority number, date | GB19890001422 | 23.01.1989 Original published format: GB 8901422 | [1990/31] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0379890 | Date: | 01.08.1990 | Language: | EN | [1990/31] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 22.05.1990 | Classification | IPC: | C12N15/62, C12N15/58, C12N15/57, C12N9/72, A61K37/547 | [1990/31] | CPC: |
C12N9/6435 (EP);
A61P7/02 (EP);
C12N9/6459 (EP);
C12Y304/21007 (EP);
C12Y304/21069 (EP);
A61K38/00 (EP);
C07K2319/00 (EP)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FR, GB, GR, IT, LI, LU, NL, SE [1990/31] | Title | German: | Gewebe-Plasminogenaktivator | [1990/31] | English: | New tissue plasminogen activator | [1990/31] | French: | Activateur tissulaire de plasminogène | [1990/31] | Biological material | This application mentions deposited biological material, check the file for details | File destroyed: | 15.01.2000 | Examination procedure | 19.06.1990 | Examination requested [1990/33] | 21.05.1993 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 26.11.1993 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 17.12.1993 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M02) | 01.03.1994 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [1994/43] | 27.05.1994 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [1994/43] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 10.01.1992 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 15.01.1993 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.01.1994 | 05   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]WO8805822 (AMERICAN HOME PROD [US]); | [A]EP0292326 (BEECHAM GROUP PLC [GB]); | [A]EP0293934 (ZYMOGENETICS INC [US], et al) | [A] - BIOCHEMISTRY, vol. 26, 1987, pages 4661-4667, American Chemical Society, Washington DC, US; K.C. ROBBINS et al.: "A covalent molecular weight - 92 000 hybrid plasminogen activator derived from human plasmin fibrin-binding and tissue plasminogen activator catalytic domains" |