EP0379055 - Mesogenic advanced epoxy compounds [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 08.09.2000 Database last updated on 17.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 08.09.2000 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 25.10.2000 [2000/43] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states THE DOW CHEMICAL COMPANY 2030 Dow Center Midland, Michigan 48674 / US | [1998/02] |
Former [1997/48] | For all designated states THE DOW CHEMICAL COMPANY 2030 Dow Center Midland, Michigan 48674 / US | ||
Former [1990/30] | For all designated states THE DOW CHEMICAL COMPANY 2030 Dow Center Abbott Road P.O. Box 1967 Midland Michigan 48640-1967 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Earls, Jimmy D. 209 Banyan Lake Jackson Texas 77566 / US | 02 /
Puckett, Paul M. 126 Daisy Lake Jackson Texas 77566 / US | [1990/30] | Representative(s) | Kremer, Robert A.M., et al BUREAU D.A. CASALONGA - JOSSE Paul-Heyse-Strasse 33 80336 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1993/44] | Kremer, Robert A.M., et al BUREAU D.A. CASALONGA - JOSSE Morassistrasse 8 D-80469 München / DE | ||
Former [1990/30] | Sternagel, Hans-Günther, Dr. Patentanwälte Dr. Michael Hann Dr. H.-G. Sternagel Sander Aue 30 D-51465 Bergisch Gladbach / DE | Application number, filing date | 90100485.3 | 11.01.1990 | [1990/30] | Priority number, date | US19890297896 | 17.01.1989 Original published format: US 297896 | [1990/30] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0379055 | Date: | 25.07.1990 | Language: | EN | [1990/30] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0379055 | Date: | 27.05.1992 | Language: | EN | [1992/22] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0379055 | Date: | 10.11.1999 | Language: | EN | [1999/45] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 03.04.1992 | Classification | IPC: | C08G59/02, C08G59/20 | [1990/30] | CPC: |
C09K19/3814 (EP);
C08G59/00 (KR);
C08G59/02 (EP);
C08G59/066 (EP);
C08G59/10 (EP);
C08G59/22 (EP);
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, ES, FR, GB, GR, IT, LI, NL, SE [1990/30] | Title | German: | Mesogene kettenverlängerte Epoxydverbindungen | [1990/30] | English: | Mesogenic advanced epoxy compounds | [1990/30] | French: | Composés époxydes allongés mésogènes | [1990/30] | Examination procedure | 09.11.1992 | Examination requested [1993/02] | 02.11.1995 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 13.05.1996 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 20.11.1996 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 23.05.1997 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 13.05.1998 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: No) | 05.03.1999 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: later approval) | 17.03.1999 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 03.05.1999 | Fee for grant paid | 03.05.1999 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 11.08.2000 | No opposition filed within time limit [2000/43] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 14.12.1991 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 07.12.1992 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 06.12.1993 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 05.12.1994 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 19.12.1995 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 25.11.1996 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 21.11.1997 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 27.11.1998 | Renewal fee patent year 10 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]JP53079998 ; | [A]US3182074 (LONCRINI DONALD F); | [A]US3725341 (ROGERS M, et al); | [Y]EP0252359 (BAYER AG [DE]); | [A]EP0287233 (UNIV NORTH DAKOTA [US]) | [X] - WORLD PATENTS INDEX Derwent Publications Ltd., London, GB; AN 78-59720A & JP-A-53 079 998 (NIPPON TELEG & TELEPH) 14 July 1978, & JP53079998 A 19780714 | [A] - MACROMOLECULES vol. 20, no. 8, August 1987, WASHINGTON DC pages 2010 - 2017; SHAUL M. AHORANI: '*Monodisperse Rodlike Oligomers and Their Mesomorphic Higher Molecular Weight Homologues*' | [A] - THE JOURNAL OF ORGANIC CHEMISTRY vol. 41, no. 15, 23 July 1976, EASTON pages 2566 - 2571; D.C. SCHROEDER, J.P. SCHROEDER: 'Liquid Crystals. Mesomorphic Phenols and Primary Amines. p-Phenylene Dibenzoates with Terminal Hydroxy and Amino Groups.' | [A] - CHEMICAL ABSTRACTS, vol. 103, no. 16, 21 October 1985, Columbus, Ohio, US; abstract no. 124509N, '*Curing agents for epoxy resins*' |