EP0381944 - Desiccant cartridge [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 25.09.1993 Database last updated on 06.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 25.09.1993 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 18.11.1993 [1993/46] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states SÜD-CHEMIE AG Lenbachplatz 6 80333 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1990/33] | For all designated states SÜD-CHEMIE AG Lenbachplatz 6 D-80333 München / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Mager, Peter Pinienweg 2 D-5000 Köln 71 / DE | 02 /
Schenkel, Willi Am Römerhof 42 D-5000 Köln 40 / DE | [1990/33] | Representative(s) | Splanemann Patentanwälte Partnerschaft Rumfordstrasse 7 80469 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1990/33] | Patentanwälte Dipl.-Ing. R. Splanemann Dr. B. Reitzner Dipl.-Ing. K. Baronetzky Tal 13 D-80331 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 90100663.5 | 13.01.1990 | [1990/33] | Priority number, date | DE19893903711 | 08.02.1989 Original published format: DE 3903711 | [1990/33] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0381944 | Date: | 16.08.1990 | Language: | DE | [1990/33] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0381944 | Date: | 25.11.1992 | Language: | DE | [1992/48] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 18.06.1990 | Classification | IPC: | B01D53/26 | [1990/33] | CPC: |
B01D53/261 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | BE, DE, FR, GB, IT [1990/33] | Title | German: | Trockenmittelpatrone | [1990/33] | English: | Desiccant cartridge | [1990/33] | French: | Cartouche pour desséchant | [1990/33] | Examination procedure | 21.07.1990 | Examination requested [1990/37] | 04.05.1991 | Request for accelerated examination filed | 03.06.1991 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 03.06.1991 | Decision about request for accelerated examination - accepted: Yes | 07.12.1991 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 31.01.1992 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 22.05.1992 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 22.08.1992 | Fee for grant paid | 22.08.1992 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 26.08.1993 | No opposition filed within time limit [1993/46] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 15.11.1991 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US3464186 (HANKISON PAUL M, et al); | [A]FR1582746 ; | [A]US4072615 (MCCONNELL WILLIAM W); | [A]DE2854710 (BBC BROWN BOVERI & CIE); | [A]US4361425 (HATA YASUHISA) |