EP0379104 - Process for annealing metal work pieces in a hydrogen-enriched protective atmosphere in a continuous furnace [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 27.08.1994 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 27.08.1994 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 19.10.1994 [1994/42] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Linde AG Abraham-Lincoln-Strasse 21 65189 Wiesbaden / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1990/30] | For all designated states Linde Aktiengesellschaft Abraham-Lincoln-Strasse 21 D-65189 Wiesbaden / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Strigl, Reinhard, Dipl.-Ing. Zeitlerstrasse 1 D-8000 München 50 / DE | 02 /
Jurmann, Alexander, Dipl.-Ing. Fasanenstrasse 68a D-8025 Unterhaching / DE | [1990/30] | Representative(s) | Schaefer, Gerhard Linde Aktiengesellschaft Zentrale Patentabteilung 82049 Höllriegelskreuth / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1990/30] | Schaefer, Gerhard, Dr. Linde Aktiengesellschaft Zentrale Patentabteilung D-82049 Höllriegelskreuth / DE | Application number, filing date | 90100679.1 | 13.01.1990 | [1990/30] | Priority number, date | DE19893901215 | 17.01.1989 Original published format: DE 3901215 | DE19893926417 | 10.08.1989 Original published format: DE 3926417 | [1990/30] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0379104 | Date: | 25.07.1990 | Language: | DE | [1990/30] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0379104 | Date: | 27.10.1993 | Language: | DE | [1993/43] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 14.05.1990 | Classification | IPC: | C21D9/56, C21D1/74 | [1990/30] | CPC: |
C21D1/74 (EP);
C21D9/565 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, DE, FR, IT, LU, NL [1990/30] | Title | German: | Verfahren zum Glühen von Metallteilen unter wasserstoffreichem Schutzgas in einem Durchlaufofen | [1990/30] | English: | Process for annealing metal work pieces in a hydrogen-enriched protective atmosphere in a continuous furnace | [1990/30] | French: | Procédé pour le recuit de pièces métalliques dans une atmosphère protectrice riche en hydrogène dans un four continu | [1990/30] | Examination procedure | 24.07.1990 | Examination requested [1990/38] | 12.05.1992 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 03.09.1992 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 23.11.1992 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 29.01.1993 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 24.03.1993 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 28.04.1993 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 25.06.1993 | Fee for grant paid | 25.06.1993 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 28.07.1994 | No opposition filed within time limit [1994/42] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 16.01.1992 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 21.01.1993 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]EP0075438 ; | [A]FR2612619 (AIR LIQUIDE [FR]); | [A]US3223396 (THOMPSON ALDEN W); | [XP]FR2628752 (AIR LIQUIDE [FR]) | [X] - STEEL IN THE USSR, Band 14, Nr. 8, August 1984, Seiten 406-409; I.Y. SOKOL et al.: "Bright annealing of steel strip in hydrogen atmosphere" | [AD] - STAHL U. EISEN, Band 107, Nr. 6, 23. März 1987, Seiten 267-273; H.W. HONERVOGT et al.: "Blankglühanlage für nichtrostende und säurebeständige Kaltbänder" | Examination | DD31283 | GB995883 | DE3809516 |