EP0385086 - Mixtures of polyalkylenterephthalate, polycarbonates and elastomers [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [1990/36] | Mixtures of polyalkylenterephthalates, polycarbonates and/or polyestercarbonates and elastomers | ||
[1994/35] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 01.07.1995 Database last updated on 15.06.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 01.07.1995 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 23.08.1995 [1995/34] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states BAYER AG 51368 Leverkusen / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1990/36] | For all designated states BAYER AG D-51368 Leverkusen / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Freitag, Dieter, Dr. Hasenheide 10 D-4150 Krefeld 1 / DE | 02 /
Idel, Karsten-Josef, Dr. Am Schwarzkamp 38 D-4150 Krefeld / DE | 03 /
Fengler, Gerd, Dr. Bethelstrasse 16 D-4150 Krefeld / DE | 04 /
Grigo, Ulrich, Dr. Michelsheide 9 D-4152 Kempen 3 / DE | 05 /
Kirsch, Jürgen, Dr. Hahnenweg 1 D-5000 Köln 80 / DE | 06 /
Westeppe, Uwe, Dr. Vogelskamp 72 D-4020 Mettman / DE | [1990/36] | Application number, filing date | 90101174.2 | 20.01.1990 | [1990/36] | Priority number, date | DE19893903102 | 02.02.1989 Original published format: DE 3903102 | [1990/36] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0385086 | Date: | 05.09.1990 | Language: | DE | [1990/36] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0385086 | Date: | 25.09.1991 | Language: | DE | [1991/39] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0385086 | Date: | 31.08.1994 | Language: | DE | [1994/35] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 08.08.1991 | Classification | IPC: | C08L67/02, C08L69/00, C08L101/00, // (C08L67/02, 69:00, 101:00) | [1990/36] | CPC: |
C08L51/003 (EP,US);
C08L67/02 (EP,KR,US);
C08G64/06 (EP,US);
C08G64/186 (EP,US);
C08G77/448 (EP,US);
C08L69/00 (EP,US)
| C-Set: |
C08L51/003, C08L2666/14 (EP,US);
C08L67/02, C08L2666/02 (US,EP);
C08L69/00, C08L2666/02 (US,EP)
| Designated contracting states | BE, DE, ES, FR, GB, IT, NL, SE [1990/36] | Title | German: | Mischungen aus Polyalkylenterephthalaten, Polycarbonaten sowie Elastomeren | [1994/35] | English: | Mixtures of polyalkylenterephthalate, polycarbonates and elastomers | [1994/35] | French: | Mélanges à base de polyalkylène téréphthalates, polycarbonates et élastomères | [1994/35] |
Former [1990/36] | Mischungen aus Polyalkylenterephthalaten, Polycarbonaten und/oder Polyestercarbonaten sowie Elastomeren | ||
Former [1990/36] | Mixtures of polyalkylenterephthalates, polycarbonates and/or polyestercarbonates and elastomers | ||
Former [1990/36] | Mélanges à base de polyalkylène téréphtalates, polycarbonates et/ou polyestercarbonates et élastomères | Examination procedure | 20.01.1990 | Examination requested [1990/36] | 08.02.1994 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 02.03.1994 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 02.05.1994 | Fee for grant paid | 02.05.1994 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 01.06.1995 | No opposition filed within time limit [1995/34] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 12.12.1991 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 16.12.1992 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 14.12.1993 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]US4368315 (SIKDAR SUBHAS K); | [Y]EP0162382 (BAYER AG [DE]); | [A]EP0297353 (BAYER AG [DE]); | [A]EP0164477 (GEN ELECTRIC [US]); | [A]EP0019127 (BAYER AG [DE]); | [A]EP0019126 (BAYER AG [DE]) |