EP0380052 - Process for preparing alkyl halogenides [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 16.02.1995 Database last updated on 07.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 16.02.1995 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 05.04.1995 [1995/14] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states SUMITOMO CHEMICAL COMPANY, LIMITED 5-33, Kitahama 4-chome Chuo-ku Osaka 305 / JP | [N/P] |
Former [1990/31] | For all designated states SUMITOMO CHEMICAL COMPANY, LIMITED 5-33, Kitahama 4-chome Chuo-ku Osaka / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Yamamoto, Michio 1-9-1-410, Tamagawa Takatsuki-shi, Osaka-fu / JP | 02 /
Ishino, Masaru 2-1-145, Kuwata-cho Ibaraki-shi, Osaka-fu / JP | 03 /
Hazama, Motoo 2-1-218, Kuwata-cho Ibaraki-shi, Osaka-fu / JP | 04 /
Tokumasu, Shigefumi 2200, Oazatsurusaki Oita-shi, Oita-ken / JP | [1990/31] | Representative(s) | Vossius & Partner Patentanwälte Rechtsanwälte mbB Siebertstrasse 3 81675 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1990/31] | VOSSIUS & PARTNER Postfach 86 07 67 D-81634 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 90101300.3 | 23.01.1990 | [1990/31] | Priority number, date | JP19890014634 | 23.01.1989 Original published format: JP 1463489 | [1990/31] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0380052 | Date: | 01.08.1990 | Language: | EN | [1990/31] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0380052 | Date: | 13.04.1994 | Language: | EN | [1994/15] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 03.04.1990 | Classification | IPC: | C07C17/28, C07C19/02, B01J31/26 | [1990/31] | CPC: |
C07C17/278 (EP,US);
C07C17/275 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | CH, DE, FR, GB, IT, LI [1990/31] | Title | German: | Verfahren zur Herstellung von Alkylhalogeniden | [1990/31] | English: | Process for preparing alkyl halogenides | [1990/31] | French: | Procédé pour la préparation d'halogénures d'alkyle | [1990/31] | Examination procedure | 28.12.1990 | Examination requested [1991/10] | 20.10.1992 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 25.02.1993 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 03.05.1993 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 14.09.1993 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 22.12.1993 | Fee for grant paid | 22.12.1993 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 14.01.1995 | No opposition filed within time limit [1995/14] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 30.01.1992 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 29.01.1993 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 28.01.1994 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US2533052 (LOUIS SCHMERLING); | [A]FR1361772 (DISTILLERS CO YEAST LTD); | [A]US3365506 (BURK JR EMMETT H, et al); | [X]DD124415 ; | [A]DE2050513 |