EP0382010 - Process for reducing the calorie content of a beverage by microbial breakdown of sugars, uses of the product and the product of the microorganism [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 29.10.1993 Database last updated on 02.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 29.10.1993 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 22.12.1993 [1993/51] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Kühne, Anton, Dr. Geeringstrasse 58 CH-8049 Zürich / CH | For all designated states Laforce, Roger, Dr. Feldstrasse 39 CH-8180 Bülach / CH | [1990/33] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
see applicant ... | [1990/33] | Representative(s) | EGLI-EUROPEAN PATENT ATTORNEYS Horneggstrasse 4 8008 Zürich / CH | [N/P] |
Former [1990/33] | EGLI-EUROPEAN PATENT ATTORNEYS Horneggstrasse 4 CH-8008 Zürich / CH | Application number, filing date | 90101471.2 | 25.01.1990 | [1990/33] | Priority number, date | CH19890000488 | 10.02.1989 Original published format: CH 48889 | [1990/33] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0382010 | Date: | 16.08.1990 | Language: | DE | [1990/33] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 05.04.1990 | Classification | IPC: | C12G3/02, C12G3/08, A23L2/34 | [1990/33] | CPC: |
C12G3/025 (EP,US);
C12G3/024 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FR, GB, GR, IT, LI, LU, NL, SE [1990/33] | Title | German: | Verfahren zur Verminderung des Kaloriengehalts in einem Getränk durch mikrobiologischen Abbau von Zuckern sowie Verwendungen des Produkts und des Mikroorganismus | [1990/33] | English: | Process for reducing the calorie content of a beverage by microbial breakdown of sugars, uses of the product and the product of the microorganism | [1990/33] | French: | Procédé pour diminuer la teneur en calories d'une boisson par dégradation microbiologique des sucres ainsi qu'utilisations du produit et du micro-organisme | [1990/33] | File destroyed: | 12.06.1999 | Examination procedure | 09.02.1991 | Examination requested [1991/14] | 01.02.1993 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 12.06.1993 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [1993/51] | 19.07.1993 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [1993/51] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 21.11.1991 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 24.12.1992 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]GB426729 (MANFRED WAHL); | [AD]CH602025 (MUELLER HANS); | [AD]CH632137 (MOOR WEM WERBEAGENTUR [CH]); | [A]EP0223705 (PERNOD RICARD [FR]); | [X]FR2601687 (UNIV DIJON [FR]); | [E]CH668887 (EIDGENOESS TECH HOCHSCHULE [CH]) |