EP0380116 - Moulding composition for manufacturing foundry models [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 02.03.1995 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 26.09.2008 | Change - representative | published on 29.10.2008 [2008/44] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states THERA Patent GmbH & Co. KG Gesellschaft für industrielle Schutzrechte Am Griesberg 2 82229 Seefeld / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1993/39] | For all designated states THERA Patent GmbH & Co. KG Gesellschaft für industrielle Schutzrechte Am Griesberg 2 D-82229 Seefeld / DE | ||
Former [1990/31] | For all designated states ESPE Stiftung & Co Produktions- und Vertriebs KG Am Griesberg 2 D-82229 Seefeld / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Gasser, Oswald, Dr. Höhenstrasse 10 D-8031 Seefeld / DE | 02 /
Guggenberger, Rainer, Dr. Siglstrasse 10 D-8036 Herrsching / DE | 03 /
Ellrich, Klaus, Dr. Auinger Strasse 16 D-8031 Wörthsee / DE | [1990/31] | Representative(s) | Müller, Bernhard Breuer & Müller Partnerschaft Patentanwälte Graf-Toerring-Strasse 45 82229 Seefeld / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2008/44] | Müller, Bernhard Breuer & Müller Partnerschaft Patentanwälte Graf-Toerring-Strasse 45 82229 Seefeld / DE | ||
Former [1990/31] | Müller, Bernhard, Dr. H. Schmidt & B. Müller Patentanwälte Graf-Toerring-Strasse 45 D-82229 Seefeld / DE | Application number, filing date | 90101531.3 | 25.01.1990 | [1990/31] | Priority number, date | DE19893902417 | 27.01.1989 Original published format: DE 3902417 | [1990/31] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0380116 | Date: | 01.08.1990 | Language: | DE | [1990/31] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0380116 | Date: | 02.05.1991 | Language: | DE | [1991/18] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0380116 | Date: | 27.04.1994 | Language: | DE | [1994/17] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 14.03.1991 | Classification | IPC: | B22C7/02, A61C13/00, C08F20/20 | [1990/31] | CPC: |
A61C13/20 (EP,US);
B22C7/02 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, CH, DE, FR, GB, LI [1990/31] | Title | German: | Formmassen zur Herstellung von Gussmodellen | [1990/31] | English: | Moulding composition for manufacturing foundry models | [1990/31] | French: | Composition à mouler pour la fabrication de modèles de fonderie | [1990/31] | Examination procedure | 18.12.1990 | Examination requested [1991/07] | 07.09.1992 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time | 18.09.1992 | Request for decision received: (all rights) | 24.09.1992 | Result of request for decision ((all rights)): Request granted | 30.06.1993 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 14.10.1993 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 23.12.1993 | Fee for grant paid | 23.12.1993 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 28.01.1995 | No opposition filed within time limit [1995/16] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 20.02.1992 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 14.12.1992 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 11.01.1994 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.01.1992 | 03   M06   Fee paid on   18.09.1992 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]JP52043719 ; | [A]CH458617 (WILLIAMS GOLD REFINING CO [US]); | [A]GB2018666 (SANKIN IND CO); | [A]EP0110193 (ESPE PHARM PRAEP [DE]); | [A]EP0198458 (ESPE PHARM PRAEP [DE]); | [A]US4844144 (MURPHY EDWARD J [US], et al) | [A] - WPI, FILE SUPPLIER, AN=77-35252Y, Derwent Publications Ltd, London, GB; & JP-A-52 043 719 (KUBOTA K.K.) 06-04-1977, & JP52043719 A 00000000 |