EP0389752 - Sports-shoe, especially usable for sports on grass [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 24.03.1994 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 24.03.1994 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 11.05.1994 [1994/19] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states ADIDAS AG Adi-Dassler-Strasse 1-2 91074 Herzogenaurach / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1990/40] | For all designated states ADIDAS AG Adi-Dassler-Strasse 1-2 D-91074 Herzogenaurach / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Anderié, Wolf Adligenswilerstr. 30 CH-6006-Luzern / CH | [1990/40] | Representative(s) | Louis Pöhlau Lohrentz Patentanwälte Postfach 30 55 90014 Nürnberg / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1990/40] | LOUIS, PÖHLAU, LOHRENTZ & SEGETH Ferdinand-Maria-Strasse 12 D-82319 Starnberg / DE | Application number, filing date | 90101768.1 | 30.01.1990 | [1990/40] | Priority number, date | DE19893910376 | 31.03.1989 Original published format: DE 3910376 | [1990/40] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0389752 | Date: | 03.10.1990 | Language: | DE | [1990/40] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0389752 | Date: | 19.05.1993 | Language: | DE | [1993/20] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 11.07.1990 | Classification | IPC: | A43B5/02 | [1990/40] | CPC: |
A43B5/02 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, FR, GB, IT, LI, NL [1990/40] | Title | German: | Sportschuh, insbesondere zur Verwendung für Rasensportarten | [1990/40] | English: | Sports-shoe, especially usable for sports on grass | [1990/40] | French: | Chaussure de sport, notamment utilisable pour des sports pratiqués sur gazon | [1990/40] | Examination procedure | 10.08.1990 | Examination requested [1990/41] | 10.06.1992 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 21.09.1992 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 24.09.1992 | Fee for grant paid | 24.09.1992 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 22.02.1994 | No opposition filed within time limit [1994/19] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 28.11.1991 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 02.12.1992 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US4712317 (SOWELL GENE H [US]) |