EP0381146 - Antigenic noninfectious HIV-producing cloned T cell [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 09.09.1995 Database last updated on 20.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 30.11.2007 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state Updated state(s): FR | published on 02.01.2008 [2008/01] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states BANYU PHARMACEUTICAL CO., LTD. 2-3, Nihonbashi Honcho 2-chome Chuo-ku, Tokyo / JP | [1990/32] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Kobayashi, Nobuyuki 382-1, Kogushi Ube-shi, Yamaguchi / JP | 02 /
Hamamoto, Yoshiaki 3-2-406 Kitakotoshiba 2-chome Ube-shi, Yamaguchi / JP | 03 /
Yamamoto, Naoki 1-7-12 Obayama-cho Ube-shi, Yamaguchi / JP | [1990/32] | Representative(s) | Klunker . Schmitt-Nilson . Hirsch Patentanwälte Destouchesstrasse 68 80796 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1990/32] | Klunker . Schmitt-Nilson . Hirsch Winzererstrasse 106 D-80797 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 90101817.6 | 30.01.1990 | [1990/32] | Priority number, date | JP19890024703 | 02.02.1989 Original published format: JP 2470389 | [1990/32] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0381146 | Date: | 08.08.1990 | Language: | EN | [1990/32] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0381146 | Date: | 09.11.1994 | Language: | EN | [1994/45] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 14.06.1990 | Classification | IPC: | C12N5/10, C12N7/00, A61K39/21, G01N33/569 | [1990/32] | CPC: |
C07K14/005 (EP,US);
C12N7/00 (EP,US);
A61K38/00 (EP,US);
A61K39/00 (EP,US);
C12N2740/16022 (EP,US);
Y10S435/974 (EP,US);
Y10S436/811 (EP,US)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | CH, DE, FR, GB, IT, LI, NL [1990/32] | Title | German: | Klonierte T-Zellen, die nichtinfektiöses, antigenes HIV produzieren | [1990/32] | English: | Antigenic noninfectious HIV-producing cloned T cell | [1990/32] | French: | Cellules T clonées produisant de HIV antigénique et non infectieux | [1990/32] | Biological material | This application mentions deposited biological material, check the file for details | File destroyed: | 20.04.2002 | Examination procedure | 30.01.1991 | Examination requested [1991/13] | 27.10.1992 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 03.05.1993 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 24.05.1993 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M05) | 27.10.1993 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 17.01.1994 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 05.05.1994 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 28.06.1994 | Fee for grant paid | 28.06.1994 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 10.08.1995 | No opposition filed within time limit [1995/44] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 30.01.1992 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 28.01.1993 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 26.01.1994 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | CH | 09.11.1994 | FR | 09.11.1994 | IT | 09.11.1994 | LI | 09.11.1994 | NL | 09.11.1994 | DE | 10.02.1995 | [2008/01] |
Former [1999/42] | CH | 09.11.1994 | |
IT | 09.11.1994 | ||
LI | 09.11.1994 | ||
NL | 09.11.1994 | ||
DE | 10.02.1995 | ||
FR | 07.04.1995 | ||
Former [1995/41] | CH | 09.11.1994 | |
LI | 09.11.1994 | ||
NL | 09.11.1994 | ||
DE | 10.02.1995 | ||
FR | 07.04.1995 | ||
Former [1995/35] | CH | 09.11.1994 | |
LI | 09.11.1994 | ||
NL | 09.11.1994 | ||
DE | 10.02.1995 | ||
Former [1995/31] | CH | 09.11.1994 | |
LI | 09.11.1994 | ||
DE | 10.02.1995 | ||
Former [1995/30] | DE | 10.02.1995 | Documents cited: | Search | [X]EP0233764 (US COMMERCE [US]); | [X]WO8706259 (US COMMERCE [US]); | [XP]EP0315459 (KATO SHIRA [JP], et al); | [XP]EP0335635 (UNIV LELAND STANFORD JUNIOR [US]) |