EP0386449 - Aircraft toilet [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 24.04.1995 Database last updated on 24.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 17.02.2006 | Change - lapse in a contracting state Updated state(s): FR | published on 05.04.2006 [2006/14] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states BAVARIA KEYTRONIC TECHNOLOGIE GMBH Boschstrasse 23 D-22761 Hamburg / DE | [1990/37] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Rogerson, Michael 2201 Alton Avenue Irvine California 92714 / US | 02 /
Klook, Silbert Garstedter Weg 256 D-2000 Hamburg 61 / DE | 03 /
Wacker, Michael Haynstrasse 30 D-2000 Hamburg 20 / DE | 04 /
Antonczyk, Volker Horster Damm 295 D-2000 Hamburg 80 / DE | [1990/37] | Representative(s) | Hansmann, Dierk Patentanwälte Hansmann-Klickow-Hansmann Jessenstrasse 4 22767 Hamburg / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1990/37] | Hansmann, Dierk, Dipl.-Ing. Patentanwälte Hansmann-Klickow-Hansmann Jessenstrasse 4 D-22767 Hamburg / DE | Application number, filing date | 90101877.0 | 31.01.1990 | [1990/37] | Priority number, date | DE19893907818 | 10.03.1989 Original published format: DE 3907818 | [1990/37] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0386449 | Date: | 12.09.1990 | Language: | DE | [1990/37] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0386449 | Date: | 31.10.1990 | Language: | DE | [1990/44] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0386449 | Date: | 22.06.1994 | Language: | DE | [1994/25] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 10.09.1990 | Classification | IPC: | B64D11/02 | [1990/37] | CPC: |
B64D11/02 (EP);
E03D5/00 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, SE [1990/37] | Title | German: | Abort für Flugzeuge | [1990/37] | English: | Aircraft toilet | [1990/37] | French: | Toilette pour aéronef | [1990/37] | File destroyed: | 03.03.2001 | Examination procedure | 22.11.1990 | Examination requested [1991/04] | 15.04.1992 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 29.07.1992 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 01.02.1993 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 21.05.1993 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 05.11.1993 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 19.11.1993 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 07.01.1994 | Fee for grant paid | 07.01.1994 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 23.03.1995 | No opposition filed within time limit [1995/24] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 04.11.1991 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 19.12.1992 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 16.12.1993 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | FR | 22.06.1994 | GB | 22.06.1994 | SE | 22.09.1994 | [2006/14] |
Former [1995/27] | GB | 22.06.1994 | |
SE | 22.09.1994 | ||
FR | 18.11.1994 | ||
Former [1995/19] | GB | 22.06.1994 | |
SE | 22.09.1994 | ||
Former [1995/05] | SE | 22.09.1994 | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]US4357719 (BADGER EVERETT H, et al); | [Y]EP0277786 (WAERTSILAE OY AB [FI]); | [Y]DE2341607 (AMTENBRINK PETER); | [Y]WO7900826 (NORLIN L); | [Y]LU86318 (KROLS JAN); | [Y]US4063315 (CAROLAN RAYMOND JEROME, et al); | [Y]FR2286922 (MONOGRAM IND INC [US]) | [Y] - ENGINEERING, (INCL. MACHINE SHOP MAGAZINE), vol. 221, no. 2, Februar 1981, LONDON, GB, Seiten 96-106 "APT" | Examination | - ENGINEERING. (INCL. MACHINE SHOP MAGAZINE) vol. 221, no. 2, Februar 1981, LONDON GB Seiten 96 - 106; "APT" *Seite 105, Absatz 2; Figur 15* |