EP0439651 - Collapsible safety attachment for ladder [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 23.02.1994 Database last updated on 06.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 13.06.2008 | Change - representative | published on 16.07.2008 [2008/29] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Riley, Jon D. 159 Hill Drive Vallejo, California 94590 / US | [1991/32] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
see applicant ... | [1991/32] | Representative(s) | Manitz Finsterwald Patent- und Rechtsanwaltspartnerschaft mbB Postfach 31 02 20 80102 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2008/29] | Manitz, Finsterwald & Partner GbR Postfach 31 02 20 80102 München / DE | ||
Former [1991/32] | Dipl.-Phys.Dr. Manitz Dipl.-Ing. Finsterwald Dipl.-Ing. Grämkow Dipl.Chem.Dr. Heyn Dipl.Phys. Rotermund Morgan, B.Sc.(Phys.) Postfach 22 16 11 D-80506 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 90101912.5 | 31.01.1990 | [1991/32] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0439651 | Date: | 07.08.1991 | Language: | EN | [1991/32] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 04.10.1990 | Classification | IPC: | E06C7/18 | [1991/32] | CPC: |
E06C7/185 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [1991/32] | Title | German: | Zusammenklappbare Sicherheitsvorrichtung für eine Leiter | [1991/32] | English: | Collapsible safety attachment for ladder | [1991/32] | French: | Dispositif de sécurité repliable pour échelle | [1991/32] | File destroyed: | 15.01.2000 | Examination procedure | 06.02.1992 | Examination requested [1992/14] | 17.05.1993 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 06.07.1993 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 19.10.1993 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [1994/15] | 18.11.1993 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: fee for grant / fee for printing not paid in time [1994/15] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 28.01.1992 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 29.01.1993 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [AD]US4770272 ; | [A]GB2093901 ; | [A]US2910135 ; | [A]FR1176421 ; | [A]US3792750 |