EP0397966 - Electrically operated lock, particularly for automotive application [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 09.02.1995 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 09.02.1995 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 29.03.1995 [1995/13] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states ROLTRA MORSE S.p.A. Via Albenga, 9 10090 Cascine Vica - Rivoli / IT | [N/P] |
Former [1990/47] | For all designated states ROLTRA-MORSE S.p.A. Via Albenga, 9 I-10090 Cascine Vica-Rivoli / IT | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Ottino, Franco Giovanni Via Ippolito Nievo, 8 I-56017 San Giuliano Terme / IT | [1990/47] | Representative(s) | Boggio, Luigi, et al Studio Torta S.p.A. Via Viotti, 9 10121 Torino / IT | [N/P] |
Former [1990/47] | Boggio, Luigi, et al STUDIO TORTA Società Semplice Via Viotti, 9 I-10121 Torino / IT | Application number, filing date | 90101933.1 | 31.01.1990 | [1990/47] | Priority number, date | IT19890067062 | 03.02.1989 Original published format: IT 6706289 | [1990/47] | Filing language | IT | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0397966 | Date: | 22.11.1990 | Language: | EN | [1990/47] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0397966 | Date: | 06.04.1994 | Language: | EN | [1994/14] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 05.06.1990 | Classification | IPC: | E05B47/00 | [1990/47] | CPC: |
E05B81/20 (EP,US);
Y10T292/1047 (EP,US);
Y10T292/1082 (EP,US);
Y10T292/1092 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, ES, FR, GB [1990/47] | Title | German: | Elektrische Türschliessvorrichtung, insbesondere für Kraftfahrzeuge | [1990/47] | English: | Electrically operated lock, particularly for automotive application | [1990/47] | French: | Dispositif de fermeture assistée, notamment pour véhicule automobile | [1990/47] | Examination procedure | 14.05.1991 | Examination requested [1991/30] | 08.09.1992 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 16.09.1992 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 15.01.1993 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 03.05.1993 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 06.09.1993 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 25.11.1993 | Fee for grant paid | 25.11.1993 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 10.01.1995 | No opposition filed within time limit [1995/13] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 23.12.1991 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 20.01.1993 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 26.01.1994 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]EP0190976 (MECANISMES COMP IND DE [FR]); | [A]DE3721962 (KIEKERT GMBH CO KG [DE], et al) |