EP0382077 - Diaryl-substituted heterocyclic compound, its preparation and medicaments and cosmetics made thereof [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 22.03.1996 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 16.08.1996 | Correction of patent specification | published on 02.10.1996 [1996/40] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states BASF Aktiengesellschaft Carl-Bosch-Strasse 38 67063 Ludwigshafen / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1990/33] | For all designated states BASF Aktiengesellschaft Carl-Bosch-Strasse 38 D-67063 Ludwigshafen / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Wüst, Hans-Heiner, Dr. Unteres Bieth 10 D-6915 Dossenheim / DE | 02 /
Janssen, Bernd, Dr. Leuschnerstrasse 18 a D-6700 Ludwigshafen / DE | 03 /
Murray, William V. Township Line Road Belle Mead, New Jersey 08502 / US | 04 /
Wachter, Michael P. 52 North Street Bloomsbury, New Jersey 08804 / US | 05 /
Bell, Stanley 732 Braeburn Lane Narbeth, Pennsylvania 19072 / US | [1990/33] | Application number, filing date | 90101947.1 | 01.02.1990 | [1990/33] | Priority number, date | DE19893903993 | 10.02.1989 Original published format: DE 3903993 | [1990/33] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0382077 | Date: | 16.08.1990 | Language: | DE | [1990/33] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0382077 | Date: | 31.07.1991 | Language: | DE | [1991/31] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0382077 | Date: | 17.05.1995 | Language: | DE | [1995/20] | Type: | B1 RE Reissue of patent specification | No.: | EP0382077 | Date: | 02.10.1996 | [1996/40] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 10.06.1991 | Classification | IPC: | C07D307/36, C07D333/08, C07D207/333, C07D231/12, C07D261/08, C07D233/64, C07D271/06, C07D237/08, A61K31/34, A61K31/38, A61K31/40 | [1990/33] | CPC: |
C07D207/323 (EP,US);
A61P17/00 (EP);
A61P17/10 (EP);
A61P29/00 (EP);
A61P35/00 (EP);
C07D207/325 (EP,US);
C07D207/337 (EP,US);
C07D231/06 (EP,US);
C07D231/12 (EP,US);
C07D231/22 (EP,US);
C07D231/24 (EP,US);
C07D233/64 (EP,US);
C07D233/84 (EP,US);
C07D237/08 (EP,US);
C07D239/36 (EP,US);
C07D261/08 (EP,US);
C07D263/04 (EP,US);
C07D263/10 (EP,US);
C07D263/32 (EP,US);
C07D271/06 (EP,US);
C07D271/107 (EP,US);
C07D277/30 (EP,US);
C07D307/36 (EP,US);
C07D307/38 (EP,US);
C07D307/40 (EP,US);
C07D307/54 (EP,US);
C07D333/08 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, FR, GB, IT, LI, NL, SE [1990/33] | Title | German: | Diarylsubstituierte heterocyclische Verbindung, ihre Herstellung und Arzneimittel und Kosmetika daraus | [1990/33] | English: | Diaryl-substituted heterocyclic compound, its preparation and medicaments and cosmetics made thereof | [1990/33] | French: | Composé hétérocyclique diaryle-substitué, sa préparation et médicaments et produits cosmétiques à partir de celui-ci | [1990/33] | Examination procedure | 27.12.1990 | Examination requested [1991/09] | 08.07.1993 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 05.10.1993 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 08.11.1993 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M02) | 08.01.1994 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 04.05.1994 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 12.07.1994 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 17.08.1994 | Fee for grant paid | 17.08.1994 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 20.02.1996 | No opposition filed within time limit [1996/19] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 19.02.1992 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 16.02.1993 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 17.02.1994 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 25.02.1995 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [AD]DE2854354 (HOFFMANN LA ROCHE); | [A]EP0064385 (UPJOHN CO [US]); | [AD]DE3202118 (BASF AG [DE]); | [A]EP0176032 (BASF AG [DE]); | [A]EP0253302 (HOFFMANN LA ROCHE [CH]); | [A]EP0284261 (ALLERGAN INC [US]); | [A]EP0176034 |