EP0382126 - Syringe having graphics visualization features [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 18.07.1997 Database last updated on 18.05.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 05.10.2005 | Change: Appeal number | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Becton Dickinson and Company One Becton Drive Franklin Lakes, NJ 07417-1880 / US | [N/P] |
Former [1990/33] | For all designated states Becton Dickinson and Company One Becton Drive Franklin Lakes, New Jersey 07417-1880 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Howe, Wesley J. 308 Indian Trail Drive Franklin Lakes, New Jersey 07417 / US | [1990/33] | Representative(s) | dompatent von Kreisler Selting Werner - Partnerschaft von Patent- und Rechtsanwälten mbB Deichmannhaus am Dom Bahnhofsvorplatz 1 50667 Köln / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1990/33] | Selting, Günther, Dipl.-Ing., et al Patentanwälte von Kreisler, Selting, Werner Postfach 10 22 41 D-50462 Köln / DE | Application number, filing date | 90102155.0 | 03.02.1990 | [1990/33] | Priority number, date | US19890308231 | 08.02.1989 Original published format: US 308231 | [1990/33] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0382126 | Date: | 16.08.1990 | Language: | EN | [1990/33] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0382126 | Date: | 03.04.1991 | Language: | EN | [1991/14] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0382126 | Date: | 11.09.1996 | Language: | EN | [1996/37] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 13.02.1991 | Classification | IPC: | A61M5/31 | [1990/33] | CPC: |
A61M5/3129 (EP,US);
A61M2205/583 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FR, GB, GR, IT, LI, LU, NL, SE [1990/33] | Title | German: | Spritze mit graphischen Anzeigevorrichtungen | [1990/33] | English: | Syringe having graphics visualization features | [1990/33] | French: | Seringue ayant des caractéristiques de visualisation graphique | [1990/33] | Examination procedure | 04.12.1990 | Examination requested [1991/05] | 15.12.1992 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 02.04.1993 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 21.05.1993 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 28.08.1993 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 28.01.1994 | Despatch of communication that the application is refused, reason: substantive examination {1} | 03.11.1995 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 12.02.1996 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 11.04.1996 | Fee for grant paid | 11.04.1996 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Appeal following examination | 25.02.1994 | Appeal received No. T0450/94 | 10.05.1994 | Statement of grounds filed | 03.11.1995 | Result of appeal procedure: remittal for grant | 03.11.1995 | Date of oral proceedings | 14.11.1995 | Minutes of oral proceedings despatched | Opposition(s) | 12.06.1997 | No opposition filed within time limit [1997/36] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 10.02.1992 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 08.02.1993 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 08.02.1994 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 10.02.1995 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 08.02.1996 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US827383 (MCELROY PATRICK J, et al); | [X]US2888015 (HUNT WILLIAM J); | [A]US3090383 (BROOKS EGAN R); | [A]US4250072 (FLYNN VINCENT J [US]); | [A]US4392852 (BUTTERFIELD IDA M) |