EP0381245 - Address translation system [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 18.04.1997 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 18.04.1997 | Withdrawal of application | published on 04.06.1997 [1997/23] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states NEC Corporation 7-1, Shiba 5-chome Minato-ku Tokyo 108-8001 / JP | [N/P] |
Former [1990/32] | For all designated states NEC CORPORATION 7-1, Shiba 5-chome Minato-ku Tokyo / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Tsubota, Masashi c/o NEC Corporation, 33-1, Shiba 5-chome Minato-ku, Tokyo / JP | [1990/32] | Representative(s) | Glawe, Delfs, Moll Partnerschaft mbB von Patent- und Rechtsanwälten Postfach 26 01 62 80058 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1990/32] | Glawe, Delfs, Moll & Partner Patentanwälte Postfach 26 01 62 D-80058 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 90102232.7 | 05.02.1990 | [1990/32] | Priority number, date | JP19890024859 | 03.02.1989 Original published format: JP 2485989 | [1990/32] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0381245 | Date: | 08.08.1990 | Language: | EN | [1990/32] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0381245 | Date: | 15.01.1992 | Language: | EN | [1992/03] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 29.11.1991 | Classification | IPC: | G06F12/10 | [1990/32] | CPC: |
G06F12/10 (KR);
G06F12/1027 (EP,US);
G06F12/1036 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, IT [1990/32] | Title | German: | Adressenübersetzungsanordnung | [1990/32] | English: | Address translation system | [1990/32] | French: | Système de traduction d'adresse | [1990/32] | Examination procedure | 05.02.1990 | Examination requested [1990/32] | 27.12.1995 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 05.07.1996 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 27.11.1996 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 08.04.1997 | Application withdrawn by applicant [1997/23] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 25.02.1992 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 18.02.1993 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 18.02.1994 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 17.02.1995 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 16.02.1996 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 18.02.1997 | Renewal fee patent year 08 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]EP0059236 (SIEMENS AG [DE]); | [A]US4792897 (GOTOU SHIZUO [JP], et al) | [Y] - IEEE COMPUTER SOCIETY INTERNATIONAL CONFERENCE (COMPCON), CONF. 33, DIGEST OF PAPERS 1988, IEEE PRESS, WASHINGTON, US pages 36 - 42; YANO ET AL: 'V60/V70 Microprocessor and its Systems Support Functions' | [ ] - * page 38, left column; figure 3 * |