EP0383149 - Folding apparatus [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 16.07.1994 Database last updated on 17.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 16.07.1994 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 07.09.1994 [1994/36] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Albert-Frankenthal AG Postfach 11 22, Johann-Klein-Strasse 1 D-67225 Frankenthal / DE | [1990/34] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Stäb, Rudolf Otto-Dill-Strasse 5 D-6710 Frankenthal / DE | [1990/34] | Representative(s) | Munk, Ludwig Patentanwälte Munk Prinzregentenstrasse 3 86150 Augsburg / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1990/34] | Munk, Ludwig, Dipl.-Ing. Patentanwalt Prinzregentenstrasse 1 D-86150 Augsburg / DE | Application number, filing date | 90102283.0 | 06.02.1990 | [1990/34] | Priority number, date | DE19893904074 | 11.02.1989 Original published format: DE 3904074 | [1990/34] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0383149 | Date: | 22.08.1990 | Language: | DE | [1990/34] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0383149 | Date: | 03.04.1991 | Language: | DE | [1991/14] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0383149 | Date: | 15.09.1993 | Language: | DE | [1993/37] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 11.02.1991 | Classification | IPC: | B65H45/22, B65H45/24 | [1990/34] | CPC: |
B65H39/06 (EP,US);
B41F13/56 (EP,US);
B65H2404/261 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | CH, DE, FR, GB, IT, LI, SE [1990/34] | Title | German: | Falzapparat | [1990/34] | English: | Folding apparatus | [1990/34] | French: | Appareil pour plier | [1990/34] | Examination procedure | 23.04.1991 | Examination requested [1991/26] | 24.02.1993 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 19.03.1993 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 11.05.1993 | Fee for grant paid | 11.05.1993 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 16.06.1994 | No opposition filed within time limit [1994/36] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 11.02.1992 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 12.02.1993 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]FR336386 (ALBERT SAUVEE [GB]); | [A]EP0005822 (FRANKENTHAL AG ALBERT [DE]); | [A]FR2437938 (MARINONI) |