EP0384236 - Powder spraying booth with a device for leading crude gas to a suction flow of a separator [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 11.11.1993 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 11.11.1993 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 29.12.1993 [1993/52] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states ESB ELEKTROSTATISCHE SPRÜH- UND BESCHICHTUNGSANLAGEN G.F. VÖHRINGER GMBH Dr. Zimmermann-Strasse 18 D-88709 Meersburg / DE | [1990/35] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Vöhringer, Gerhard Friedrich Zum Burgstall 14 D-7778 Markdorf / DE | [1990/35] | Representative(s) | Braito, Herbert Patentanwalt Widdersteinstrasse 17 88400 Biberach / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1990/35] | Braito, Herbert, Dipl.-Ing. Patentanwalt Postfach 11 40 D-88381 Biberach/Riss / DE | Application number, filing date | 90102538.7 | 09.02.1990 | [1990/35] | Priority number, date | DE19893905057 | 18.02.1989 Original published format: DE 3905057 | [1990/35] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0384236 | Date: | 29.08.1990 | Language: | DE | [1990/35] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0384236 | Date: | 07.01.1993 | Language: | DE | [1993/01] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 05.06.1990 | Classification | IPC: | B05B15/12 | [1990/35] | CPC: |
B05B14/48 (EP,US);
Y02P70/10 (EP);
Y10S118/07 (EP,US);
Y10S55/46 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, CH, DE, FR, GB, IT, LI, SE [1990/35] | Title | German: | Pulversprühkabine mit einer Leitvorrichtung für Rohgas in eine Abscheider-Saugströmung | [1990/35] | English: | Powder spraying booth with a device for leading crude gas to a suction flow of a separator | [1990/35] | French: | Cabine d'atomisation à poudre avec dispositif pour guider le gaz brut dans un courant aspirateur d'un séparateur | [1990/35] | Examination procedure | 07.08.1990 | Examination requested [1990/40] | 14.05.1992 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 10.07.1992 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 01.10.1992 | Fee for grant paid | 01.10.1992 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 08.10.1993 | No opposition filed within time limit [1993/52] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 04.02.1992 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | SE | 07.01.1993 | [1993/32] | Documents cited: | Search | [AD]GB1315671 (BERRIDGE ENG LTD); | [A]US4245551 (BERKMANN ADOLF [DE]); | [A]US4354451 (VOEHRINGER GERHARD F, et al); | [A]DE3229717 (ESB VOEHRINGER [DE]); | [A]ATE10445T | Examination | EP0035905 |